EP2516242 - STRUCTURAL PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA VPIB - LG081 Route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | For all designated states Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA Route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUCHY, Laurent 17 rue du Mosnil F-91590 Baulne / FR | [2012/44] | Representative(s) | Fernandez, Francis Lionel PSA Automobiles SA VPIB - LG081 18 rue des Fauvelles 92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | Fernandez, Francis Lionel PSA Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA. Propriété Industrielle (LG081) 18, Rue des Fauvelles 92250 La Garenne-Colombes / FR | Application number, filing date | 10807452.7 | 01.12.2010 | WO2010FR52589 | Priority number, date | FR20090059439 | 22.12.2009 Original published format: FR 0959439 | [2012/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011083221 | Date: | 14.07.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2516242 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2516242 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/06, B60J7/00 | [2012/44] | CPC: |
B62D25/06 (EP);
B60J7/0015 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BAUTEIL | [2012/44] | English: | STRUCTURAL PART | [2012/44] | French: | PIECE DE STRUCTURE | [2012/44] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 23.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.12.2010 | AL | 12.02.2014 | AT | 12.02.2014 | BG | 12.02.2014 | CY | 12.02.2014 | CZ | 12.02.2014 | DK | 12.02.2014 | EE | 12.02.2014 | FI | 12.02.2014 | HR | 12.02.2014 | IT | 12.02.2014 | LT | 12.02.2014 | LV | 12.02.2014 | MC | 12.02.2014 | MK | 12.02.2014 | MT | 12.02.2014 | NL | 12.02.2014 | PL | 12.02.2014 | RO | 12.02.2014 | RS | 12.02.2014 | SE | 12.02.2014 | SI | 12.02.2014 | SK | 12.02.2014 | SM | 12.02.2014 | TR | 12.02.2014 | NO | 12.05.2014 | GR | 13.05.2014 | IS | 12.06.2014 | PT | 12.06.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 01.12.2010 | |
AT | 12.02.2014 | ||
BG | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
IT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
MK | 12.02.2014 | ||
MT | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
RS | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
SM | 12.02.2014 | ||
TR | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
GR | 13.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 01.12.2010 | |
AT | 12.02.2014 | ||
BG | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
IT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
MT | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
RS | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
SM | 12.02.2014 | ||
TR | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
GR | 13.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 01.12.2010 | |
AT | 12.02.2014 | ||
BG | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
IT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
RS | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
SM | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
GR | 13.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BG | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
IT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
RS | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
SM | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
GR | 13.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
IT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
RS | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
SM | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
IT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
RS | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
SM | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
IT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
RS | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
IT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
RS | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
RS | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
RS | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RS | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RS | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 12.02.2014 | |
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2873648 (WEBASTO SYSTEMES CARROSSERIE S [FR]) [A] 1,5 * figures 1,3; claim 1 * * sentence 9 - sentence 29; claim 5 *; | [A]EP1721769 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1,5 * figures 1,2,4,7,8,9,10,11,14,; claim 1 * * paragraphs [0006] , [0008] *; | [A]JP2008168778 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1,5* abstract * |