EP2507970 - METHOD FOR SENDING AND PROCESSING A SIP RESPONSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/41] | METHODS FOR SENDING AND PROCESSING AN SIP RESPONSE | ||
[2019/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Transpacific IP Group Limited PO Box 10008 Willow House, Cricket Square Grand Cayman KY1-1001 / KY | [2018/12] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Orange 78, rue Olivier de Serres 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2012/41] | For all designated states France Telecom 6 place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOIZARD, Stéphane 465C Chemin de Cotité F-31620 Fronton / FR | 02 /
PROUVOST, Sébastien 78 Ter Chemin de Lanusse F-31300 Toulouse / FR | 03 /
CLEUZIOU, Olivier 18 rue Monmousseau - Bâtiment C F-94200 Ivry Sur Seine / FR | [2012/45] |
Former [2012/41] | 01 /
BOIZARD, Stéphane 39 chemin de Cotité F-31620 Fronton / FR | ||
02 /
PROUVOST, Sébastien 57 allée Charles de Fitte F-31300 Toulouse / FR | |||
03 /
CLEUZIOU, Olivier 18 rue Monmousseau - Bâtiment C F-94200 Ivry Sur Seine / FR | Representative(s) | Eidelsberg, Olivier Nathan, et al Cabinet Flechner 22, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [2020/25] |
Former [2012/41] | Delumeau, François Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10807455.0 | 02.12.2010 | [2020/25] | WO2010FR52597 | Priority number, date | FR20090058666 | 04.12.2009 Original published format: FR 0958666 | [2012/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011067540 | Date: | 09.06.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2507970 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2507970 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2012/41] | CPC: |
H04L65/1104 (EP,US);
H04L45/28 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN UND VERARBEITEN VON SIP-ANTWORTEN | [2012/41] | English: | METHOD FOR SENDING AND PROCESSING A SIP RESPONSE | [2019/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'ENVOI ET DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE RÉPONSE SIP | [2019/51] |
Former [2012/41] | METHODS FOR SENDING AND PROCESSING AN SIP RESPONSE | ||
Former [2012/41] | PROCÉDÉS D'ENVOI ET DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE REPONSE SIP | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/41] | 14.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   02.07.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.12.2010 | AL | 17.06.2020 | AT | 17.06.2020 | CY | 17.06.2020 | CZ | 17.06.2020 | DK | 17.06.2020 | EE | 17.06.2020 | ES | 17.06.2020 | FI | 17.06.2020 | HR | 17.06.2020 | IT | 17.06.2020 | LT | 17.06.2020 | LV | 17.06.2020 | MC | 17.06.2020 | MK | 17.06.2020 | MT | 17.06.2020 | NL | 17.06.2020 | PL | 17.06.2020 | RO | 17.06.2020 | RS | 17.06.2020 | SE | 17.06.2020 | SI | 17.06.2020 | SK | 17.06.2020 | SM | 17.06.2020 | TR | 17.06.2020 | BG | 17.09.2020 | NO | 17.09.2020 | GR | 18.09.2020 | IS | 17.10.2020 | PT | 19.10.2020 | GB | 02.12.2020 | IE | 02.12.2020 | LU | 02.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | FR | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/32] | HU | 02.12.2010 | |
AL | 17.06.2020 | ||
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CY | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
MK | 17.06.2020 | ||
MT | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
TR | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
GB | 02.12.2020 | ||
IE | 02.12.2020 | ||
LU | 02.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 02.12.2010 | |
AL | 17.06.2020 | ||
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CY | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
MT | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
TR | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
GB | 02.12.2020 | ||
IE | 02.12.2020 | ||
LU | 02.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
TR | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
GB | 02.12.2020 | ||
IE | 02.12.2020 | ||
LU | 02.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
GB | 02.12.2020 | ||
IE | 02.12.2020 | ||
LU | 02.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
GB | 02.12.2020 | ||
IE | 02.12.2020 | ||
LU | 02.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
GB | 02.12.2020 | ||
IE | 02.12.2020 | ||
LU | 02.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
GB | 02.12.2020 | ||
IE | 02.12.2020 | ||
LU | 02.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
IE | 02.12.2020 | ||
LU | 02.12.2020 | ||
FR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
IE | 02.12.2020 | ||
LU | 02.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
IE | 02.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
MC | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SI | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
DK | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
PL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SK | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
IS | 17.10.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
AT | 17.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2020 | ||
EE | 17.06.2020 | ||
ES | 17.06.2020 | ||
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
IT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RO | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
SM | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
PT | 19.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 17.06.2020 | |
FI | 17.06.2020 | ||
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
NL | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
BG | 17.09.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
RS | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
HR | 17.06.2020 | ||
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
LV | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
GR | 18.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 17.06.2020 | |
LT | 17.06.2020 | ||
SE | 17.06.2020 | ||
NO | 17.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 17.06.2020 | |
NO | 17.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1528818 (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0026] *; | [A]WO2009086935 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 7, line 10 - page 10, line 5 *; | [X]US2009196183 (KAKADIA DEEPAK KUMAR [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0071] * | Examination | US2008098117 | - SPARKS DYNAMICSOFT R, "The Session Initiation Protocol (SIP) Refer Method; rfc3515.txt", NETWORK WORKING GROUP RFC 1717, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, CH, (20030401), ISSN 0000-0003, XP015009297 | by applicant | WO2009086935 | US2009196183 |