EP2466685 - INTEGRATED ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.11.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.01.2014 [2014/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited 5-27, Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited 5-27, Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | ||
For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSHIMA, Hideaki c/o Nippon Sheet Glass Company Limited 5-27 Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | 02 /
KOMATSU, Satoru c/o HONDA R&D CO. LTD. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2012/25] | Representative(s) | Strobel, Wolfgang, et al Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | Strobel, Wolfgang, et al Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10808184.5 | 06.08.2010 | WO2010JP63400 | Priority number, date | JP20090186402 | 11.08.2009 Original published format: JP 2009186402 | [2012/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011019001 | Date: | 17.02.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2466685 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q7/00, H01Q1/32, H01Q9/16, H01Q21/30, H01Q1/12, H01Q5/00, H01Q9/28 | [2013/01] | CPC: |
H01Q1/1271 (EP,US);
H01Q5/371 (EP,US);
H01Q7/00 (EP,US);
H01Q9/28 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/25] | H01Q7/00, H01Q1/32, H01Q9/16, H01Q21/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/25] | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTE ANTENNE | [2012/25] | English: | INTEGRATED ANTENNA | [2012/25] | French: | ANTENNE INTÉGRÉE | [2012/25] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2012 | Translation filed | 11.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/25] | 02.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/01] | 16.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2008123360 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3 * abstract *; | [P]EP2136434 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [P] * abstract * * paragraphs [0026] - [0032] *; | [Y]US5198826 (ITO MICHIAKI [JP]) [Y] 1-3 * figure 7 * * column 6, paragraphs 8-59 *; | [A]US2009160717 (TSUTSUMI YUKAKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * figures 1,12 * * paragraphs [0035] - [0042] * * paragraphs [0068] - [0071] *; | [A]US6600450 (EFANOV ANDREW A [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract * * column 3, line 66 - column 5, line 13 * | International search | [Y]WO2008123360 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JPH03108903 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD); | [Y]JPS61121010U (THE FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD.) | by applicant | JP2006186488 |