EP2462079 - SUPPORT FOR A FIRED ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce Corporation 2001 S. Tibbs Avenue, Mail Drop U27 Indianapolis, IN 46241 / US | [2012/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAGUIRE, Michael, Christopher 79 Winedale Lane Napa CA 94558 / US | 02 /
BALDWIN, Michael, Dean 4050 Linda Vista Drive Napa CA 94558 / US | 03 /
SCHLIENGER, Max, Eric 14 Remington Court Napa CA 94558 / US | 04 /
EUGENIO, Ariel 217 West Tennys Drive Benicia CA 94510 / US | [2012/24] | Representative(s) | Cawley, Aimee Elizabeth, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Holmes, Matthew Peter Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10808604.2 | 09.08.2010 | WO2010US44924 | Priority number, date | US20090232446P | 09.08.2009 Original published format: US 232446 P | [2012/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011019672 | Date: | 17.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2462079 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C04B33/32, B28B7/34, B22C7/02, B22C9/04, B28B7/00 | [2015/13] | CPC: |
C04B33/32 (EP,US);
B22C7/02 (EP,US);
B22C9/04 (EP,US);
B28B7/342 (EP,US);
B28B7/346 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6028 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/24] | C04B33/32, B28B7/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/24] | Title | German: | TRÄGER FÜR EINEN GEBRANNTEN ARTIKEL | [2012/24] | English: | SUPPORT FOR A FIRED ARTICLE | [2012/24] | French: | SUPPORT POUR UN ARTICLE CUIT | [2012/24] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/24] | 22.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/17] | 22.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.10.2012 | 31.08.2020 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1308958 (MONSANTO CHEMICALS) [X] 13-15 * First page, left column, lines 37-46;; claim 1 *; | [X]US5818149 (SAFARI AHMAD [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,13 * Column 4, lines 27-38; column 9, lines 18-52 *; | [X]US6000457 (VANDERMEER JOHN [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * example 1; claims 1,12 *; | [X]US6481490 (VIHTELIC JOSEPH M [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * Abstract;;; example 1; claim 1 *; | [X]US6749006 (YANG XI [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5* Column 8, lines 45-50;;; example 1; claims 1,4 *; | [X]US2009008058 (CHAUDHRY ANIL R [US], et al) [X] 1-5,13-15 * Abstract; claim 1; paragraph [0044] * | International search | [X]US3747663 (TAYLOR P); | [A]US2001042607 (ROESLER HANS-JOACHIM [DE], et al); | [A]US6431255 (GHOSH ASISH [US], et al); | [A]US2002157799 (SACHS EMANUEL M [US], et al); | [Y]US6481490 (VIHTELIC JOSEPH M [US], et al); | [Y]US2003057096 (MORALES ALFREDO MARTIN [US], et al); | [Y]US6582812 (GRYLLS RICHARD JOHN [US], et al); | [Y]US2009123810 (DEVOE ALAN [US], et al) |