EP2465121 - SOLID INSULATION FOR FLUID-FILLED TRANSFORMER AND METHOD OF FABRICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Waukesha Electric Systems, Inc. 400 South Prairie Avenue Waukesha, WI 53186 / US | [2012/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOLNER, Thomas, M. W. 277 N. 2242 Lakeview Dr. Pewaukee WI 53072 / US | 02 /
MEHTA, Shirish, P. W. 270 S. 25270 Apache Pass Waukesha WI 53186 / US | 03 /
VARANASI, Padma, P. c/o Waukesha Electric Systems, Incorporated 400 S Prairie Avenue Waukesha, WI 53186 / US | 04 /
NEMEC, Jeffrey, J. 34611 Breens Rd. Oconomowoc WI 53066 / US | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/21] | 01 /
GOLNER, Thomas, M. W. 277 N. 2242 Lakeview Dr. Pewaukee WI 53072 / US | ||
02 /
MEHTA, Shirish, P. W. 270 S. 25270 Apache Pass Waukesha WI 53186 / US | |||
03 /
VARANASI, Padma, P. c/o Waukesha Electric Systems, Incorportated 400 S Prairie Avenue Waukesha, WI 53186 / US | |||
04 /
NEMEC, Jeffrey, J. 34611 Breens Rd. Oconomowoc WI 53066 / US | |||
Former [2012/39] | 01 /
GOLNER, Thomas, M. W. 277 N. 2242 Lakeview Dr. Pewaukee WI 53072 / US | ||
02 /
MEHTA, Shirish, P. W. 270 S. 25270 Apache Pass Waukesha WI 53186 / US | |||
03 /
VARANASI, Padma, P. 1910 Norhardt Dr. Brookfield, WI 53045 / US | |||
04 /
NEMEC, Jeffrey, J. 34611 Breens Rd. Oconomowoc WI 53066 / US | |||
Former [2012/25] | 01 /
GOLNER, Thomas, M. W. 277 N. 2242 Lakeview Dr. Pewaukee WI 53072 / US | ||
02 /
MEHTA, Shirish, P. W. 270 S. 25270 Apache Pass Waukesha WI 53186 / US | |||
03 /
VARANASI, Padma, P. 1910 Norhardt Dr. Brookfield WI 53045 / US | |||
04 /
NEMEC, Jeffrey, J. 34611 Breens Rd. Oconomowoc WI 53066 / US | Representative(s) | Guy, Elizabeth, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [2012/25] | Application number, filing date | 10808798.2 | 13.08.2010 | WO2010US45423 | Priority number, date | US20090540437 | 13.08.2009 Original published format: US 540437 | [2012/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011019983 | Date: | 17.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2465121 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2465121 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/12, H01F27/32, H01B3/48 | [2013/38] | CPC: |
H01F27/12 (EP,US);
H01F27/32 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T29/4902 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/38] | H01F27/32, H01B3/48 | ||
Former IPC [2012/25] | H01F27/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FESTSTOFFISOLIERUNG FÜR EINEN FLÜSSIGKEITSGEFÜLLTEN TRANSFORMATOR UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2012/25] | English: | SOLID INSULATION FOR FLUID-FILLED TRANSFORMER AND METHOD OF FABRICATION THEREOF | [2012/25] | French: | ISOLATION SOLIDE POUR TRANSFORMATEUR REMPLI DE FLUIDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANT | [2012/25] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 13.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/25] | 11.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.08.2010 | AL | 12.03.2014 | AT | 12.03.2014 | BE | 12.03.2014 | CY | 12.03.2014 | CZ | 12.03.2014 | DK | 12.03.2014 | EE | 12.03.2014 | ES | 12.03.2014 | FI | 12.03.2014 | HR | 12.03.2014 | IT | 12.03.2014 | LT | 12.03.2014 | LV | 12.03.2014 | MC | 12.03.2014 | MK | 12.03.2014 | MT | 12.03.2014 | NL | 12.03.2014 | PL | 12.03.2014 | RO | 12.03.2014 | SI | 12.03.2014 | SK | 12.03.2014 | SM | 12.03.2014 | TR | 12.03.2014 | BG | 12.06.2014 | NO | 12.06.2014 | GR | 13.06.2014 | IS | 12.07.2014 | PT | 14.07.2014 | IE | 13.08.2014 | LU | 13.08.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 13.08.2010 | |
AT | 12.03.2014 | ||
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
MK | 12.03.2014 | ||
MT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
SM | 12.03.2014 | ||
TR | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
IE | 13.08.2014 | ||
LU | 13.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 13.08.2010 | |
AT | 12.03.2014 | ||
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
MT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
SM | 12.03.2014 | ||
TR | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
IE | 13.08.2014 | ||
LU | 13.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 13.08.2010 | |
AT | 12.03.2014 | ||
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
MT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
SM | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
IE | 13.08.2014 | ||
LU | 13.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
MT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
SM | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
IE | 13.08.2014 | ||
LU | 13.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
SM | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
IE | 13.08.2014 | ||
LU | 13.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
IE | 13.08.2014 | ||
LU | 13.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
LU | 13.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
LU | 13.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 12.03.2014 | |
NO | 12.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]FR2430652 (COMP GENERALE ELECTRICITE [FR]) [X] 1-4,7,10,11 [I] 5,6,8,9,12; | [XI]US6980076 (ROLLING DAVID J [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,10-12 * abstract * * column 1, line 30 - column 6, line 21 * * column 13, line 13 - column 14, line 66 * * figures 1-6 * [I] 5,9; | [XI]WO2004025024 (FIBERMARK INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,10,12 * abstract * * page 1, line 13 - page 7, line 28 * [I] 3,5,9,11; | [A]EP0272497 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD [JP], et al) [A] 3 * page 3, line 39 - page 4, line 54 *; | [E]WO2010141757 (LYDALL INC [US], et al) [E] 1-7,9-12 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 7 - page 6, paragraph 11 * * page 7, paragraph 17 - page 8, paragraph 19 * * page 9, paragraph 26 - page 18, paragraph 50 * * page 21, paragraph 57 - page 22, paragraph 60 * * page 29, paragraph 77 - page 32, paragraph 86 * | International search | [X]US4095205 (SCHROEDER STEPHEN M, et al); | [Y]US4009306 (YAMASHITA KAZUO, et al); | [Y]US4450424 (SADLER FRED S [US], et al); | [Y]US3503797 (HAGIWARA HIROSHI, et al); | [Y]US6525272 (HIGASHIURA ATSUSHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US5057353 (MARANCI ARTUN [US], et al); | [Y]US6426310 (KURUMATANI SHIGERU [JP], et al); | [Y]US6855404 (ANDERSON DAVID WAYNE [US], et al); | [A]WO2009020989 (DU PONT [US], et al) | [Y] - DUPONT., "Technical Guide for NOMEX Brand Fiber. Manual", DUPONT, (200107), URL: http://www2.dupont.com/Personal_Protection/en_US/assets/downloads/nomex/Nomex_Technical_Guide_pdf, (20100928), XP008154632 |