EP2465046 - VIRTUAL OBJECT INDIRECTION IN A HOSTED COMPUTER ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2017/45] |
Former [2017/24] | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | ||
Former [2012/25] | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARM, Michael, W. 18 E. 13th Street Apt. 9 New York New York 10003 / US | 02 /
FIERRO, Hugo, G. 372 Central Park West Apt. 17V New York New York 10025 / US | 03 /
KHOSROWSHAHI, Farzad 185 Deerfield Lane North Pleasantville New York 10570 / US | [2012/25] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2017/24] |
Former [2014/24] | Qip Patentanwälte Dr. Kuhn & Partner mbB Goethestraße 8 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/23] | Kühn, Ralph, et al Gautinger Strasse 13b 82234 Weßling / DE | ||
Former [2013/34] | Kühn, Ralph Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/25] | Schley, Jan Malte, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Str. 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10808847.7 | 13.08.2010 | [2017/24] | WO2010US45531 | Priority number, date | US20090540927 | 13.08.2009 Original published format: US 540927 | [2012/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011020066 | Date: | 17.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2465046 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2465046 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.06.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, G06F9/30, G06F9/06, G06F17/00, G06F9/54 | [2013/43] | CPC: |
G06F9/541 (EP,US);
G06F15/16 (KR);
G06F17/00 (KR);
G06F9/06 (KR);
G06F9/30 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2012/25] | G06F15/16, G06F9/30, G06F9/06, G06F17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INDIREKTION VIRTUELLER OBJEKTE IN EINER HOST-COMPUTERUMGEBUNG | [2012/25] | English: | VIRTUAL OBJECT INDIRECTION IN A HOSTED COMPUTER ENVIRONMENT | [2012/25] | French: | ADRESSAGE INDIRECT D'OBJET VIRTUEL DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT INFORMATIQUE HÉBERGÉ | [2012/25] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2012 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/25] | 09.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.08.2010 | AL | 14.06.2017 | AT | 14.06.2017 | CY | 14.06.2017 | CZ | 14.06.2017 | DK | 14.06.2017 | EE | 14.06.2017 | ES | 14.06.2017 | FI | 14.06.2017 | HR | 14.06.2017 | IT | 14.06.2017 | LT | 14.06.2017 | LV | 14.06.2017 | MC | 14.06.2017 | MK | 14.06.2017 | NL | 14.06.2017 | PL | 14.06.2017 | PT | 14.06.2017 | RO | 14.06.2017 | SE | 14.06.2017 | SI | 14.06.2017 | SK | 14.06.2017 | SM | 14.06.2017 | TR | 14.06.2017 | IE | 13.08.2017 | LU | 13.08.2017 | MT | 13.08.2017 | BE | 31.08.2017 | CH | 31.08.2017 | FR | 31.08.2017 | LI | 31.08.2017 | BG | 14.09.2017 | NO | 14.09.2017 | GR | 15.09.2017 | IS | 14.10.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 13.08.2010 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CY | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MK | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PT | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IE | 13.08.2017 | ||
LU | 13.08.2017 | ||
MT | 13.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 13.08.2010 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CY | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MK | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IE | 13.08.2017 | ||
LU | 13.08.2017 | ||
MT | 13.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 13.08.2010 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CY | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MK | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
IE | 13.08.2017 | ||
LU | 13.08.2017 | ||
MT | 13.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 13.08.2010 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CY | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
IE | 13.08.2017 | ||
LU | 13.08.2017 | ||
MT | 13.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 13.08.2010 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
IE | 13.08.2017 | ||
LU | 13.08.2017 | ||
MT | 13.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
IE | 13.08.2017 | ||
LU | 13.08.2017 | ||
MT | 13.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
IE | 13.08.2017 | ||
LU | 13.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
IE | 13.08.2017 | ||
LU | 13.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 14.06.2017 | |
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | ES | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1126657 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 13 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0074] * [Y] 1-12,14,15; | [Y]US2003070006 (NADLER RICHARD L [US], et al) [Y] 1-12,14,15* paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0030]; claim 1 * | International search | [A]US2002120672 (BUTT ALAN B [US], et al); | [A]US2007094372 (HARIHARAN RAJARAMAN [IN], et al); | [A]US2008301120 (ZHU JIN [US], et al) |