EP2467669 - COMBINATION SQUARE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2015 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marc & Muff Pty Ltd 24 Falconer St West Ryde New South Wales 2114 / AU | [2012/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERNIMAN, Ean 24 Falconer St West Ryde, New South Wales 2114 / AU | 02 /
DI GIULIO, Marc 24 Falconer St West Ryde, New South Wales 2114 / AU | [2015/17] |
Former [2012/26] | 01 /
HERNIMAN, Ean 24 Falconer St West Ryde New South Wales 2114 / AU | ||
02 /
DI GIULIO, Marc 24 Falconer St West Ryde New South Wales 2114 / AU | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | ||
Former [2012/26] | Freeman, Avi Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place GB-London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 10809372.5 | 20.08.2010 | WO2010AU01072 | Priority number, date | AU20090903936 | 20.08.2009 Original published format: AU 2009903936 | [2012/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011020156 | Date: | 24.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2467669 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 24.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01B3/02, F16H53/00, B43L7/02, G01B5/02 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
G01B3/566 (EP,US);
B43L7/005 (EP,US);
B43L7/007 (EP,US);
B43L7/02 (EP,US);
B43L7/14 (EP,US);
G01B3/56 (US);
B43L13/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/26] | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONSQUADRAT | [2012/26] | English: | COMBINATION SQUARE | [2012/26] | French: | ÉQUERRE COMBINÉE | [2012/26] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 19.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 19.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/26] | 03.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/35] | 01.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US705867 (RICHARDSON HARRY H [US]); | [X]US3334498 (EDWARD STANWAY); | [Y]US5430947 (COURTNEY ROBERT M [US]); | [X]US5992034 (PRUCHA MARK [US], et al); | [A]US2007017108 (HANSON CRAIG A [US]) |