EP2467597 - A BLADE FOR A WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Windworks Engineering Limited Griva Digeni 115 Trident Centre Limassol 3101 / CY | [2012/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HESSAMODINI, Azad 170 Hensman Road Shenton Park Western Australia 6008 / AU | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | Schenk, Markus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Schenk, Markus, et al Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann Stöckeler, Zinkler & Partner Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10809376.6 | 20.08.2010 | WO2010AU01078 | Priority number, date | AU20090903949 | 20.08.2009 Original published format: AU 2009903949 | [2012/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011020160 | Date: | 24.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2467597 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 24.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F03D3/06, F03D11/04 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
F03D3/061 (EP,US);
F05B2240/213 (EP,US);
F05B2240/301 (EP,US);
F05B2250/12 (EP,US);
F05B2250/25 (EP,US);
Y02E10/74 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/26] | Title | German: | ROTORBLATT FÜR EINE WINDTURBINE | [2012/26] | English: | A BLADE FOR A WIND TURBINE | [2012/26] | French: | AUBE POUR EOLIENNE | [2012/26] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 20.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/26] | 05.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/24] | 16.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.11.2012 | 31.08.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006119648 (ARROWIND CORP [CA], et al) [A] 1-15* figures 1-5 *; | [XI]US2007029807 (KASS CLAYTON [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9-12,15 * paragraphs [0053] , [0054]; figures 1-8 * [I] 4,8; | [A]WO2007115353 (VORTECH ENERGY & POWER PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 7, lines 1-5 * | International search | [X]US6428275 (JAAKKOLA REIJO [FI]); | [X]US2007029807 (KASS CLAYTON [US]); | [X]WO2007115353 (VORTECH ENERGY & POWER PTY LTD [AU], et al) |