EP2469682 - QUICK CHARGING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.2014 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.01.2015 [2015/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JFE Engineering Corporation 6-2 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2012/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIKAWA, Hirofumi c/o Technology Planning Dept. JFE ENGINEERING CORPORATION 1 Suehiro-cho 2-chome Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230-8611 / JP | 02 /
HARAYAMA, Masami c/o Technology Planning Dept. JFE ENGINEERING CORPORATION 1 Suehiro-cho 2-chome Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230-8611 / JP | 03 /
IMAIZUMI, Masato c/o Technology Planning Dept. JFE ENGINEERING CORPORATION 1 Suehiro-cho 2-chome Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230-8611 / JP | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10810055.3 | 19.08.2010 | WO2010JP64424 | Priority number, date | JP20090191507 | 21.08.2009 Original published format: JP 2009191507 | JP20100145894 | 28.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010145894 | [2012/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011021718 | Date: | 24.02.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2469682 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, H01M10/44, B60L11/18, H01M10/46, H01M6/50, // H02J3/14 | [2013/51] | CPC: |
H01M10/46 (EP,US);
B60L1/006 (EP,US);
B60L53/00 (EP,US);
B60L53/11 (EP,US);
B60L53/14 (EP,US);
B60L53/53 (EP,US);
B60L58/20 (EP,US);
H02J7/342 (EP,US);
B60L2240/547 (EP,US);
B60L2240/549 (EP,US);
H01M10/44 (EP,US);
H01M6/5033 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/26] | H02J7/00, H01M10/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/26] | Title | German: | SCHNELLLADEVORRICHTUNG | [2012/26] | English: | QUICK CHARGING DEVICE | [2012/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHARGE RAPIDE | [2012/26] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2012 | Translation filed | 01.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 01.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/26] | 14.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/03] | 23.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CA2381035 (POWERGENIX SYSTEMS INC [CA]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0060] * * claims 1,8 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US2005122071 (KING ROBERT D [US], et al) [X] 1,5-7 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0024] * * figures 1-11 *; | [X]EP1810861 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,5 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0005] ** figures 3,10 *; | [X]EP2006974 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 5 * figure 1 * | International search | [Y]JPH09298806 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]JPH11332023 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [Y]JP2002095174 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [Y]JP3123576U (NOBORU ITO); | [Y]WO2007105612 (NEC CORP [JP], et al); | [A]WO2008102543 (INST ENERGY APPLIC TECHNOLOGIE [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPH06253461 |