EP2473924 - NETWORK ANALYTICS MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Level 3 Communications, LLC 1025 Eldorado Boulevard Broomfield, CO 80021 / US | [2012/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIDDLETON, Ted 4086 Bending Oak Court Moorpark California 93021 / US | 02 /
NEWTON, Christopher 981 Via Colinas Westlake Village California 91362 / US | [2012/28] | Representative(s) | Ford, Esther Mary Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | Ford, Esther Mary Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10812776.2 | 31.08.2010 | WO2010US47398 | Priority number, date | US20090238682P | 31.08.2009 Original published format: US 238682 P | US20100836438 | 14.07.2010 Original published format: US 836438 | [2012/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011026138 | Date: | 03.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2473924 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16 | [2012/28] | CPC: |
H04L67/125 (EP,US);
H04L67/568 (EP,US);
H04L65/612 (EP,US);
H04L67/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/28] | Title | German: | NETZWERKANALYSEVERWALTUNG | [2012/28] | English: | NETWORK ANALYTICS MANAGEMENT | [2012/28] | French: | GESTION D'ANALYTIQUE DE RÉSEAU | [2012/28] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/28] | 03.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 27.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2019 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008184245 (ST-JEAN RICHARD [CA]) [A] 1-9,11-15* paragraphs [0009] - [0111] *; | [I]US2008262907 (BROADY GEORGE VINCENT [US], et al) [I] 1-9,11-15 * paragraphs [0011] - [0090] *; | [A]US2008300909 (RIKHTVERCHIK SONYA [US], et al) [A] 1-9,11-15 * paragraph [0047] * * figure 1 * | International search | [Y]US2008184245 (ST-JEAN RICHARD [CA]); | [Y]US2008262907 (BROADY GEORGE VINCENT [US], et al); | [A]US2009158367 (MYERS GARY [US], et al) |