EP2519814 - METHOD FOR THE COMPARATIVE ANALYSIS OF PROTEIN PREPARATIONS BY MEANS OF NUCLEAR MAGNETIC RESONANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.E.R.B.M. Parc d'Innovation 1 rue Laurent Fries B.P. 10142 67400 Illkirch Graffenstaden / FR | For all designated states NMRTEC Bioparc Boulevard Sébastien Brandt 67400 Illkirch Graffenstaden / FR | For all designated states Université de Strasbourg 4, rue Blaise Pascal 67000 Strasbourg / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/45] | For all designated states C.E.R.B.M. Parc d'Innovation 1 rue Laurent Fries B.P. 10142 67400 Illkirch Graffenstaden / FR | ||
For all designated states NMRTEC Bioparc Boulevard Sébastien Brandt 67400 Illkirch Graffenstaden / FR | |||
For all designated states Université de Strasbourg 4, rue Blaise Pascal 67000 Strasbourg / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STARCK, Jean-Philippe 12 rue des Tilleuls F-67270 Gougenheim / FR | 02 /
KIEFFER, Bruno 7 rue Henri Heine F-67100 Strasbourg / FR | 03 /
QUINTERNET, Marc 7 rue des Pâquis 54220 Malzeville / FR | [2012/45] | Representative(s) | Barny, Luc Cabinet Barny 52, avenue des Vosges 67000 Strasbourg / FR | [2012/45] | Application number, filing date | 10812874.5 | 30.12.2010 | WO2010FR52936 | Priority number, date | FR20090006427 | 31.12.2009 Original published format: FR 0906427 | [2012/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011080492 | Date: | 07.07.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2519814 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N24/08, G01R33/46, G01R33/465 | [2012/45] | CPC: |
G01R33/465 (EP,US);
G01N24/08 (EP,US);
G01N24/087 (EP,US);
G01R33/4633 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERGLEICHENDEN ANALYSE VON PROTEINZUBREITUNGEN MITTELS KERNMAGNETRESONANZ | [2012/45] | English: | METHOD FOR THE COMPARATIVE ANALYSIS OF PROTEIN PREPARATIONS BY MEANS OF NUCLEAR MAGNETIC RESONANCE | [2012/45] | French: | METHODE D'ANALYSE COMPARATIVE DE PREPARATIONS PROTEIQUES PAR RESONANCE MAGNETIQUE NUCLEAIRE | [2012/45] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/45] | 02.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/50] | 02.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0975954 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [AD] 1-7,9,10 * the whole document *; | [XI] - AUBIN Y ET AL, "Assessment of the three-dimensional structure of recombinant protein therapeutics by NMR fingerprinting: Demonstration on recombinant human granulocyte macrophage-colony stimulation factor", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20080401), vol. 80, no. 7, doi:DOI:10.1021/AC7026222, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 2623 - 2627, XP007918475 [X] 1-7,10 * page 2623 - page 2625; figures 1,2 * [I] 9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac7026222 | [L] - SAUVÉ SIMON ET AL, "NMR assignment of human granulocyte-macrophage colony-stimulating factor", BIOMOLECULAR NMR ASSIGNMENTS, SPRINGER, NL, vol. 2, no. 1, ISSN 1874-2718, (20080601), pages 5 - 7, (20071208), XP007918476 [L] 1-7,9,10 * the whole document * * Ce document complète la divulgation de la méthode du document XP007918475, qui cite explicitement le document XP007918476. * | [XI] - BOCIAN WOJCIECH ET AL, "Direct insight into insulin aggregation by 2D NMR complemented by PFGSE NMR", PROTEINS: STRUCTURE, FUNCTION AND GENETICS, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC, US LNKD- DOI:10.1002/PROT.21969, (20080515), vol. 71, no. 3, ISSN 0887-3585, pages 1057 - 1065, XP007914270 [X] 1-7,9 * abstract * * page 1058, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 1059, column 1, paragraph 3; figures 3,4 * [I] 10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/prot.21969 | [XI] - AGRAWAL P ET AL, "Solution studies on the complex of 4'-epiadriamycin-d-(CGATCG)2 followed by time-resolved fluorescence measurement, diffusion ordered spectroscopy and restrained molecular dynamics simulations", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, PERGAMON, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.BMC.2009.02.032, vol. 17, no. 7, ISSN 0968-0896, (20090401), pages 2793 - 2811, (20090224), XP026073630 [X] 1-7 * page 2794; figures 2-4; tables 1a,1b * * page 2801; figure 7 * * page 2809 - page 2810 * [I] 9,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2009.02.032 | [XPI] - PANJWANI N ET AL, "Assessment of the effects of pH, formulation and deformulation on the conformation of interferon alpha-2 by NMR", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, AMERICAN PHARMACEUTICAL ASSOCIATION, WASHINGTON, US, (20100223), vol. 99, no. 8, doi:DOI:10.1002/JPS.22105, ISSN 0022-3549, pages 3334 - 3342, XP007918517 [XP] 1-7 * page 3334 - page 3340; figures 1,2,3 * [I] 9,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.22105 | [I] - GOGER M ET AL, "Molecular insights into PEBP2/CBF[beta]-SMMHC associated acute leukemia revealed from the structure of PEBP2/CBF[beta]", NATURE STRUCTURAL BIOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19990101), vol. 6, no. 7, ISSN 1072-8368, pages 620 - 623, XP007914200 [I] 1-7,9,10 * page 620, column 2; figure 2 * * page 623, column 1 * | [I] - MARKUS ZEEB ET AL, "Recognition of T-rich single-stranded DNA by the cold shock protein Bs-CspB in solution", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, vol. 34, no. 16, ISSN 0305-1048, (20060901), pages 4561 - 4571, (20060901), XP007914178 [I] 1-7,9,10 * page 2 - page 8; figures 1,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkl376 | [I] - ABDULAEV N G ET AL, "Heterotrimeric G-protein [alpha]-subunit adopts a preactivated conformation when associated with [beta][gamma]-subunits", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 280, no. 45, ISSN 0021-9258, (20050829), pages 38071 - 38080, (20051111), XP007914180 [I] 1-7,9,10 * page 38072, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 38075; figures 4,5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M505259200 | [I] - WAGNER G ET AL, "SYSTEMATIC APPLICATION OF 2 DIMENSIONAL PROTON NMR TECHNIQUES FOR STUDIES OF PROTEINS 2. COMBINED USE OF CORRELATED SPECTROSCOPY AND NUCLEAR OVERHAUSER SPECTROSCOPY FOR SEQUENTIAL ASSIGNMENTS OF BACKBONE RESONANCES AND ELUCIDATION OF POLY PEPTIDE SECONDARY STRUCTURES", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, BLACKWELL PUBLISHING, BERLIN, DE, (19810101), vol. 114, no. 2, ISSN 0014-2956, pages 375 - 384, XP007914199 [I] 1-7,9,10 * page 375 - page 379; figures 1-3,5-8,10 * | [AD] - SATTLER M ET AL, "Heteronuclear multidimensional NMR experiments for the structure determination of proteins in solution employing pulsed field gradients", PROGRESS IN NUCLEAR MAGNETIC RESONANCE SPECTROSCOPY, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (19990319), vol. 34, no. 2, ISSN 0079-6565, pages 93 - 158, XP007914139 [AD] 1-7,9,10 * pages 95,146; table 1 * * page 154 * | [AD] - SCHANDA P ET AL, "Very fast two-dimensional NMR spectroscopy for real-time investigation of dynamic events in proteins on the time scale of seconds", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, NEW YORK, US LNKD- DOI:10.1021/JA051306E, (20050608), vol. 127, no. 22, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 8014 - 8015, XP007914137 [AD] 1-7,9,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja051306e | [AD] - BALAYSSAC S ET AL, "Two-dimensional DOSY experiment with Excitation Sculpting water suppression for the analysis of natural and biological media", JOURNAL OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE, ACADEMIC PRESS, ORLANDO, FL, US LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.JMR.2008.09.022, vol. 196, no. 1, ISSN 1090-7807, (20090101), pages 78 - 83, (20080930), XP025746052 [AD] 1-7,9,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmr.2008.09.022 | [AD] - CHANG X ET AL, "Solution structures of the R6 human insulin hexamer", BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 36, no. 31, ISSN 0006-2960, (19970805), pages 9409 - 9422, (19970805), XP007914160 [AD] 1-7,9,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi9631069 | by applicant | EP0975954 | WO2008128219 | - SATTLER ET AL., PROG NUE MAG RESON SPECTRO, (1999), vol. 34, no. 2, pages 93 - 158 | - C.S. JOHNSON JR., "Diffusion ordered nuclear magnetic resonance spectroscopy: principles and applications", PROG. NMR SPECTROSC., (1999), vol. 34, doi:doi:10.1016/S0079-6565(99)00003-5, pages 203 - 256, XP002216416 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0079-6565(99)00003-5 | - BALAYSSAC S. ET AL., J. MAGN. RESON., (2009), vol. 196, pages 78 - 83 | - SCHANDA ET AL., J AM CHEM SOC, (2005), vol. 127, no. 22, pages 8014 - 15 | - Biochimie Générale, page 17 | - CHANG X. ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1997), vol. 36, pages 9409 - 9422 | - SCHANDA P. ET AL., J. BIOMOL. NMR, (2005), vol. 33, pages 199 - 211 |