EP2494118 - INSULATING WALL CLADDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/36] | UNDERCLADDING INSULATION AND CLADDING SUPPORT SYSTEMS AND TO WALL STRUCTURES USING THE SAME | ||
[2015/36] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 17.05.2019 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2019 | Opposition rejected | published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states James Hardie Technology Limited Europa House, Second Floor Harcourt Centre Harcourt Street Dublin 2 / IE | [2012/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLEESON, James James Hardie Research Pty Ltd 10 Colquhoun Street Rosehill, NSW 2142 / AU | 02 /
PECNIK, Roger c/o James HardieResearch Pty Ltd 10 Colquhoun Street Rosehill NSW 2142 PO Box 70 Parramatta NSW 2124 / AU | 03 /
TWIN, Steve Greasley House 104 Huntingdon Road Upwood Huntingdon Cambridgeshire PE26 2QQ / GB | [2012/36] | Representative(s) | Lenney, James Patrick James Hardie Technology Limited Europa House, 2nd Floor, Harcourt Centre Harcourt Street Dublin 2 / IE | [2012/36] | Application number, filing date | 10812890.1 | 29.10.2010 | [2016/07] | WO2010IB03256 | Priority number, date | AU20090905307 | 29.10.2009 Original published format: AU 2009905307 | [2012/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011051818 | Date: | 05.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2494118 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2494118 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/76 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
E04B1/762 (EP);
E04B1/765 (EP);
E04F13/0864 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ISOLIERENDE WANDVERKLEIDUNG | [2015/36] | English: | INSULATING WALL CLADDING | [2015/36] | French: | REVÊTEMENT ISOLANT | [2015/36] |
Former [2012/36] | SYSTEME ZUR ISOLIERUNG UNTER EINER FASSADE UND FASSADENSTÜTZUNG SOWIE WANDSTRUKTUREN DAMIT | ||
Former [2012/36] | UNDERCLADDING INSULATION AND CLADDING SUPPORT SYSTEMS AND TO WALL STRUCTURES USING THE SAME | ||
Former [2012/36] | SYSTÈMES DE SUPPORT DE REVÊTEMENT ET D'ISOLEMENT SOUS UN REVÊTEMENT ET STRUCTURES DE PAROI LES UTILISANT& xA; | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 06.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.11.2016
21.11.2016
ADMISSIBLE REDCO N.V. Kuiermanstraat 1 B-1880 Kapelle-op-den-Bos / BE Opponent's representative Vaeck, Elke Etex Services NV Kuiermansstraat 1 1880 Kapelle-op-den-Bos / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.11.2016
REDCO N.V. Kuiermanstraat 1 B-1880 Kapelle-op-den-Bos / BE Opponent's representative Vaeck, Elke Redco NV Intellectual Property Service Center Etex Group Kuiermansstraat 1 BE-1880 Kapelle-op-den-Bos / BE | 22.12.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.04.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.11.2018 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2019/25] | 27.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.02.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.02.2019 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.10.2010 | AL | 17.02.2016 | AT | 17.02.2016 | BE | 17.02.2016 | CY | 17.02.2016 | CZ | 17.02.2016 | DK | 17.02.2016 | EE | 17.02.2016 | ES | 17.02.2016 | FI | 17.02.2016 | HR | 17.02.2016 | IS | 17.02.2016 | IT | 17.02.2016 | LT | 17.02.2016 | LV | 17.02.2016 | MC | 17.02.2016 | MK | 17.02.2016 | NL | 17.02.2016 | PL | 17.02.2016 | RO | 17.02.2016 | RS | 17.02.2016 | SE | 17.02.2016 | SI | 17.02.2016 | SK | 17.02.2016 | SM | 17.02.2016 | TR | 17.02.2016 | BG | 17.05.2016 | NO | 17.05.2016 | GR | 18.05.2016 | PT | 17.06.2016 | IE | 29.10.2016 | LU | 29.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | MT | 31.10.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 29.10.2010 | |
AT | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CY | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
IS | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
MK | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
TR | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
IE | 29.10.2016 | ||
LU | 29.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 29.10.2010 | |
AT | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CY | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
IS | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
MK | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
TR | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
IE | 29.10.2016 | ||
LU | 29.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 29.10.2010 | |
AT | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CY | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
MK | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
TR | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
IE | 29.10.2016 | ||
LU | 29.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 29.10.2010 | |
AT | 17.02.2016 | ||
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CY | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
HR | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
MC | 17.02.2016 | ||
MK | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
IE | 29.10.2016 | ||
LU | 29.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
IE | 29.10.2016 | ||
LU | 29.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
LU | 29.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SI | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
BG | 17.05.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
BE | 17.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
CZ | 17.02.2016 | ||
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RO | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
SK | 17.02.2016 | ||
SM | 17.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
EE | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
DK | 17.02.2016 | ||
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LV | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
RS | 17.02.2016 | ||
SE | 17.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
PT | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 17.02.2016 | |
ES | 17.02.2016 | ||
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
IT | 17.02.2016 | ||
LT | 17.02.2016 | ||
NL | 17.02.2016 | ||
PL | 17.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 17.02.2016 | |
FI | 17.02.2016 | ||
NO | 17.05.2016 | ||
GR | 18.05.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]DE202006012370U (BOEHM MARTIN E [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,9,14,15 * paragraph [0031]; figures 7,8 * [Y] 6 [I] 7,8,10,11,13,17; | [YA]GB2116600 (ISOPAG AG) [Y] 3,12 * figures 1a,2a,3,4; claim 8 * [A] 10,11; | [Y]US6119429 (BIFANO GABRIEL F [US], et al) [Y] 3,6,12,16 * column 4, lines 17-24; figure 34 *; | [A]WO2004007193 (JAMES HARDIE RES PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 7 * page 4, lines 14-23 *; | [Y]US4604846 (EKSTROEM LEIF E J [SE]) [Y] 16 * column 4, lines 22-38; figure 7 * | by applicant | WO0168547 | AU515151B | WO0231287 | AU2006230666 | Opposition | GB2227765 | US2002083662 |