EP2515863 - SLOW RELEASE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS OF ILOPERIDONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2017 | Change - priority | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lupin Limited 159 CST Road Kalina Santacruz (East) Mumbai - 400 098 Maharashtra / IN | [2012/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHUTADA, Pravin, Meghrajji c/o Lupin Limited (Research Park) 46A/47A Village Nande Taluka Mulshi, Maharashtra 411 042 Pune / IN | 02 /
CHANDRAN, Sajeev c/o Lupin Limited (Research Park) 46A/47A Village Nande Taluka Mulshi, Maharashtra 411 042 Pune / IN | 03 /
DESHMUKH, Ashish, Ashokrao c/o Lupin Limited (Research Park) 46A/47A Village Nande Taluka Mulshi, Maharashtra 411 042 Pune / IN | 04 /
KULKARNI, Shirishkumar c/o Lupin Limited (Research Park) 46A/47A Village Nande Taluka Mulshi, Maharashtra 411 042 Pune / IN | [2012/44] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | Nony 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 10812902.4 | 23.12.2010 | WO2010IB03346 | Priority number, date | IN2009KOL1473 | 23.12.2009 Original published format: IN 1473KO2009 | [2017/16] |
Former [2012/44] | IN2009KOL1473 | 23.12.2009 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011077239 | Date: | 30.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2515863 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K9/28, A61K31/454, A61K9/50, A61K9/20 | [2012/44] | CPC: |
A61K9/2866 (EP,US);
A61K31/454 (EP,US);
A61K9/0004 (EP,US);
A61K9/0007 (EP,US);
A61K9/0065 (EP,US);
A61K9/2013 (EP,US);
A61K9/2027 (EP,US);
A61K9/2031 (EP,US);
A61K9/2054 (EP,US);
A61K9/2086 (EP,US);
A61K9/209 (EP,US);
A61K9/2846 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ILOPERIDONZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT VERZÖGERTER FREISETZUNG | [2012/44] | English: | SLOW RELEASE PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS OF ILOPERIDONE | [2012/44] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES D'ILOPÉRIDONE À LIBÉRATION LENTE | [2012/44] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 04.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/52] | 03.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03037337 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,5,11,12 * page 3, line 8 - line 9 * * examples 1-4; claim - *; | [X]WO2004006886 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,5,11,12 * example -; claim - *; | [XD]US2008069878 (VENKATESH GOPI [US], et al) [XD] 1-4,11,12 * example 10 *; | [I]WO2007137224 (VANDA PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [I] 1-5,11,12 * page 14, line 9 - page 15, line 12 *; | [ID]WO2007137227 (VANDA PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [ID] 1-5,11,12 * page 7, line 10 - page 8, line 6 * | by applicant | USRE39198E | US2005020632 | US2009176739 | US2009306137 | US2010273809 | WO2009076664 | US2008069878 | US4765989 | US4783337 | US4612008 | US6630162 |