EP2479473 - LIGHT-BULB SHAPED LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.2013 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/30] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUI, Nobuyuki c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center, 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
TANIMOTO, Noriyasu c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center, 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2012/30] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [2012/30] | Unland, Jochen Hermann, et al Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner P.O. Box 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10812973.5 | 13.09.2010 | WO2010JP05589 | Priority number, date | JP20090212087 | 14.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009212087 | [2012/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011030567 | Date: | 17.03.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2479473 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F21S2/00, F21Y101/02 | [2012/30] | CPC: |
F21K9/65 (EP,US);
F21K9/23 (EP,US);
F21K9/238 (EP,US);
F21V14/02 (EP,US);
F21V23/006 (EP,US);
F21V3/0615 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/30] | Title | German: | GLÜHBIRNE | [2012/30] | English: | LIGHT-BULB SHAPED LAMP | [2012/30] | French: | LAMPE EN FORME D'AMPOULE | [2012/30] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2011 | Translation filed | 01.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2012 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/30] | 27.09.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2009004130 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JP2009043447 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JP2007059260 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY); | [Y]JP2007188832 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY); | [Y]JP2006302532 (ICHIKOH INDUSTRIES LTD); | [Y]JP3123535U (KOKUI CHO); | [A]JP2006310207 (ENEGATE KK) | by applicant | JP2009037995 | JP2005276467 | JP2008251444 |