EP2513147 - NOVEL ANTAGONIST ANTIBODIES AND THEIR FAB FRAGMENTS AGAINST GPVI AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2016/29] |
Former [2012/43] | For all designated states SANOFI 54, rue de la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAURIN, Nicolas c/o Sanofi-Aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | 02 /
BLANCHE, Francis c/o Sanofi-Aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | 03 /
CAMERON, Béatrice c/o Sanofi-Aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | 04 /
CORVEY, Carsten c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | 05 /
DABDOUBI, Tarik c/o Sanofi-Aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | 06 /
ENGEL, Christian c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | 07 /
FLORIAN, Peter c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | 08 /
FOCKEN, Ingo c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | 09 /
KROLL, Katja c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | 10 /
KRUIP, Jochen c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | 11 /
LANGE, Christian c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | 12 /
LANGER, Thomas c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | 13 /
LORENZ, Martin c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | 14 /
MIKOL, Vincent c/o Sanofi-Aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | 15 /
RAO, Ercole c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | 16 /
WONEROW, Peter c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | [2016/29] |
Former [2012/43] | 01 /
BAURIN, Nicolas c/o sanofi-aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France F-75013 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
BLANCHE, Francis c/o sanofi-aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France F-75013 Paris / FR | |||
03 /
CAMERON, Béatrice c/o sanofi-aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France F-75013 Paris / FR | |||
04 /
CORVEY, Carsten c/o sanofi-aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | |||
05 /
DABDOUBI, Tarik c/o sanofi-aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France F-75013 Paris / FR | |||
06 /
ENGEL, Christian c/o sanofi-aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | |||
07 /
FLORIAN, Peter c/o sanofi-aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | |||
08 /
FOCKEN, Ingo c/o sanofi-aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | |||
09 /
KROLL, Katja c/o sanofi-aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | |||
10 /
KRUIP, Jochen c/o sanofi-aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | |||
11 /
LANGE, Christian c/o sanofi-aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | |||
12 /
LANGER, Thomas c/o sanofi-aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | |||
13 /
LORENZ, Martin c/o sanofi-aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | |||
14 /
MIKOL, Vincent c/o sanofi-aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France F-75013 Paris / FR | |||
15 /
RAO, Ercole c/o sanofi-aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | |||
16 /
WONEROW, Peter c/o sanofi-aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | |||
Former [2011/32] | 01 /
BAURIN, Nicolas c/o sanofi-aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France F-75013 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
BLANCHE, Francis c/o sanofi-aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France F-75013 Paris / FR | |||
03 /
CAMERON, Béatrice c/o sanofi-aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France F-75013 Paris / FR | |||
04 /
CORVEY, Carsten c/o sanofi-aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | |||
05 /
DABDOUBI, Tarik c/o sanofi-aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France F-75013 Paris / FR | |||
06 /
ENGEL, Christian c/o sanofi-aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | |||
07 /
FLORIAN, Peter c/o sanofi-aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | |||
08 /
FOCKEN, Ingo c/o sanofi-aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | |||
09 /
KROLL, Katja c/o sanofi-aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | |||
10 /
KRUIP, Jochen c/o sanofi-aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | |||
11 /
LANGE, Christian c/o sanofi-aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | |||
12 /
LANGER, Thomas c/o sanofi-aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | |||
13 /
LORENZ, Martin c/o sanofi-aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | |||
14 /
MIKOL, Vincent c/o sanofi-aventis Département Brevets 174 avenue de France F-75013 Paris / FR | |||
15 /
RAO, Ercole c/o sanofi-aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | |||
16 /
WONEROW, Peter c/o sanofi-aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent Department 65926 Frankfurt / DE | Representative(s) | Zwicker, Jörk ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/29] | Zwicker, Jörk ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/43] | Martin-Touaux, Elsa, et al Sanofi Département Brevets 174 avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 10813028.7 | 17.12.2010 | [2016/29] | WO2010IB55917 | Priority number, date | EP20090306283 | 18.12.2009 Original published format: EP 09306283 | EP20100305660 | 21.06.2010 Original published format: EP 10305660 | EP20100305721 | 01.07.2010 Original published format: EP 10305721 | [2011/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011073954 | Date: | 23.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2513147 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2513147 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K39/00, C07K1/107 | [2016/06] | CPC: |
C07K16/2803 (EP,US);
C07K16/28 (KR,US);
A61K38/17 (KR);
A61K38/18 (KR);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61K48/00 (KR);
A61K49/14 (KR);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K1/1075 (US);
C07K14/435 (KR);
C07K14/475 (KR);
C07K16/18 (KR);
C07K16/22 (KR);
C07K16/24 (KR);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/33 (EP,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,US);
C07K2317/41 (EP,US);
C07K2317/51 (US);
C07K2317/515 (US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,US);
C07K2317/565 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/32] | C07K16/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Extension states | BA | 10.09.2012 | ME | 10.09.2012 | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE ANTAGONISTENANTIKÖRPER UND IHRE FAB-FRAGMENTE GEGEN GPVI SOWIE VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2012/43] | English: | NOVEL ANTAGONIST ANTIBODIES AND THEIR FAB FRAGMENTS AGAINST GPVI AND USES THEREOF | [2012/43] | French: | NOUVEAUX ANTICORPS ANTAGONISTES ET LEURS FRAGMENTS FAB DIRIGÉS CONTRE GPVI, ET UTILISATIONS DE CEUX-CI | [2012/43] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 08.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 18.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15164863.1 / EP2933269 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/26] | Request for further processing for: | 18.07.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 18.07.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.08.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 20.07.2016 | MK | 20.07.2016 | RS | 20.07.2016 | SM | 20.07.2016 | NO | 20.10.2016 | IS | 20.11.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | MK | 20.07.2016 | |
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | RS | 20.07.2016 | |
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | RS | 20.07.2016 | |
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | NO | 20.10.2016 | Cited in | International search | [I]WO0100810 (MILLENNIUM PHARM INC [US]) [I] 1-6,9-13,15 * the whole document *; | [I]EP1224942 (NIESWANDT BERNHARD [DE]) [I] 1-6,9-13,15 * the whole document *; | [I]EP1228768 (NIESWANDT BERNHARD [DE]) [I] 1-6,9-13,15 * the whole document *; | [I]WO02080968 (MILLENNIUM PHARM INC [US]) [I] 1-6,9-13,15 * the whole document *; | [I]WO03054020 (UNIV CAMBRIDGE TECH [GB], et al) [I] 1-6,9-13,15 * the whole document *; | [I]EP1369128 (PROCORDE GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-6,9-13,15 * the whole document *; | [I]EP1538165 (PROCORDE GMBH [DE], et al) [I] 1-6,9-13,15 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO2005090407 (IMCLONE SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [X] 7,8 * The whole document, in particular SEQ ID NO:17-19 *[I] 9-13; | [I]WO2005111083 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al) [I] 1-6,9-13,15 * The whole document, in particular; paragraph [0122]; table 7 *; | [I]EP1647596 (MOCHIDA PHARM CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-6,9-13,15 * The whole document, in particular;; figure 5 *; | [I]WO2006061650 (TRIGEN GMBH [DE], et al) [I] 1-6,9-13,15 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2006131512 (TRIGEN GMBH [DE], et al) [I] 1-6,9-13,15 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2007091719 (MOCHIDA PHARM CO LTD [JP], et al) [I] 1-6,9-13,15 * the whole document *; | [I]EP1876240 (MOCHIDA PHARM CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-6,9-13,15 * The whole document, in particular;; table 2 *; | [I]EP1916259 (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED [FR]) [I] 1-6,9-13,15 * The whole document, in particular;; figure 8 *; | [I]EP2000802 (MOCHIDA PHARM CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-6,9-13,15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2009041783 (TAKAYAMA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-6,9-13,15 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2009058326 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al) [I] 1-6,9-13,15 * The whole document, in particular; paragraph [0009] *; | [I] - NIESWANDT BERNHARD ET AL, "Long-term antithrombotic protection by in vivo depletion of platelet glycoprotein VI in mice", THE JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, ROCKEFELLER UNIVERSITY PRESS, UNITED STATES, (20010219), vol. 193, no. 4, ISSN 0022-1007, pages 459 - 469, XP002174652 [I] 1-6,9-13,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.193.4.459 | [I] - SCHULTE VALERIE ET AL, "Two-phase antithrombotic protection after anti-glycoprotein VI treatment in mice", ARTERIOSCLEROSIS, THROMBOSIS, AND VASCULAR BIOLOGY, HIGHWIRE PRESS, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (20060701), vol. 26, no. 7, ISSN 1524-4636, pages 1640 - 1647, XP002486445 [I] 1-6,9-13,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/.ATV.0000225697.98093.ed | [XI] - ASHUTOSH TIWARI ET AL, "Generation and Characterization of High Affinity Humanized Fab Against Hepatitis B Surface Antigen", MOLECULAR BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20090901), vol. 43, no. 1, doi:10.1007/s12033-009-9165-9, ISSN 1073-6085, pages 29 - 40, XP055016065 [X] 7,8 * the whole document * [I] 9-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12033-009-9165-9 | Examination | - Andreas Plückthun, "Strategies for the expression of antibody fragments in Escherichia coli", Methods, (19910401), vol. 2, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S1046-2023(05)80208-7, ISSN 1046-2023, pages 88 - 96, XP055085444 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1046-2023(05)80208-7 | by applicant | US6448380 | WO2009032661 | - NIESWANDT B; WATSON SP, BLOOD, (20030715), vol. 102, no. 2, pages 449 - 61 | - LOCKYER S ET AL., THROMB RES., (2006), vol. 118, no. 3, pages 371 - 80 | - KARLSSON R; LARSSON A, J. MOL. BIOL., (2004), vol. 248, pages 389 - 415 | - KORMEIER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1968), vol. 100, no. 3, pages 612 - 21 | - PERSSELIN; STEVENS, J. CLIN.LNVEST., (1985), vol. 76, pages 723 - 30 | - BIGALKE B. ET AL., SEMIN THROMB HEMOST., (200703), vol. 33, no. 2, pages 179 - 84 | - A. H. HORWITZ ET AL., PNAS, (198811), vol. 85, no. 22, pages 8678 - 82 | - CHIBA Y; JIGAMI Y, CURR OPIN CHEM BIOL., (200712), vol. 11, no. 6, pages 670 - 6 | - KILPATRICK ET AL., HYBRIDOMA, (1997), vol. 16, page 381389 | - CANZIANI ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (2004), vol. 325, pages 301 - 307 | - YOUNG L.; DONG Q., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (2004), vol. 32, no. 7, page E59 | - DUROCHER ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (2002), vol. 30, no. 2, page E9 | - AI-LAZIKANI, J. MOL. BIOL., (1997), vol. 273, pages 927 - 948 |