EP2473670 - METHOD AND ASSEMBLY FOR PROCESSING CELLULOSE PULP OF WOOD PROCESSING INDUSTRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Andritz Oy Tammasaarenkatu 1 00180 Helsinki / FI | [2012/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KETTUNEN, Auvo Vanamotie 11 FI-48800 Kotka / FI | [2012/28] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10813389.3 | 31.08.2010 | WO2010FI50675 | Priority number, date | FI20090000313 | 01.09.2009 Original published format: FI 20090313 | [2012/28] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011027029 | Date: | 10.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2473670 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 10.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | D21C9/08, D21C9/04, // D21C9/147, D21C11/00 | [2017/28] | CPC: |
D21C11/00 (EP,FI,US);
D21C11/0007 (US);
D21C11/0028 (EP,US);
D21C7/00 (US);
D21C9/02 (FI,US);
D21C9/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/28] | D21C9/02, D21C11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG EINER ZELLULOSEPULPE FÜR DIE HOLZVERARBEITENDE INDUSTRIE | [2012/28] | English: | METHOD AND ASSEMBLY FOR PROCESSING CELLULOSE PULP OF WOOD PROCESSING INDUSTRY | [2012/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET ENSEMBLE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE PÂTE CELLULOSIQUE ISSUE DE L'INDUSTRIE DE TRANSFORMATION DU BOIS | [2012/28] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2012 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/28] | 13.06.2014 | Observations by third parties | 03.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/21] | 02.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/21] | Divisional application(s) | EP17179997.6 / EP3249098 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0047812 (KIRAM AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006071165 (KVAERNER PULPING TECH [SE], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0716182 (ALCELL TECH INC [CA]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0073575 (VALMET CHEMICAL PULPING OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002088567 (HENRICSON KAJ [FI], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9411567 (KAMYR AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9617996 (AHLSTROEM OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5919337 (OLSSON SVEN-ERIK [SE], et al); | [A]WO02088461 (KVAERNER PULPING TECH [SE], et al) | [A] - ME BOTNIALAISET, (200305), pages 12 - 13, URL: www.metsabotnia.com/default.asp?path=1;79;80;335;345, XP008185872 | by applicant | WO0047812 | WO2006071165 | other | US5203963 | US4451332 |