EP2474204 - LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/28] | LIGHT-EMITTING ELEMENT, LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME | ||
[2016/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co, Ltd. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa, 243-0036 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | For all designated states Semiconductor Energy Laboratory Co, Ltd. 398, Hase Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0036 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHITAGAKI, Satoko c/o SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LABORATORY CO. LTD. 398 Hase Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0036 / JP | [2012/28] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/04] |
Former [2012/28] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10813604.5 | 04.08.2010 | [2017/04] | WO2010JP63595 | Priority number, date | JP20090205300 | 04.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009205300 | [2012/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011027653 | Date: | 10.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2474204 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2474204 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/12, H01L51/52 | [2016/41] | CPC: |
H10K50/13 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/11 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/14 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/324 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/633 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/6572 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/28] | H05B33/12, H01L51/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG | [2016/39] | English: | LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE | [2016/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT | [2016/39] |
Former [2012/28] | LICHTEMITTIERENDES ELEMENT, LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG DAMIT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2012/28] | LIGHT-EMITTING ELEMENT, LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME | ||
Former [2012/28] | ÉLÉMENT ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CEUX-CI | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/28] | 10.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.08.2010 | AL | 25.01.2017 | AT | 25.01.2017 | CY | 25.01.2017 | CZ | 25.01.2017 | DK | 25.01.2017 | EE | 25.01.2017 | ES | 25.01.2017 | FI | 25.01.2017 | HR | 25.01.2017 | IT | 25.01.2017 | LT | 25.01.2017 | LV | 25.01.2017 | MC | 25.01.2017 | MK | 25.01.2017 | NL | 25.01.2017 | PL | 25.01.2017 | RO | 25.01.2017 | SE | 25.01.2017 | SI | 25.01.2017 | SK | 25.01.2017 | SM | 25.01.2017 | TR | 25.01.2017 | BG | 25.04.2017 | NO | 25.04.2017 | GR | 26.04.2017 | IS | 25.05.2017 | PT | 25.05.2017 | GB | 04.08.2017 | IE | 04.08.2017 | LU | 04.08.2017 | MT | 04.08.2017 | BE | 31.08.2017 | CH | 31.08.2017 | FR | 31.08.2017 | LI | 31.08.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 04.08.2010 | |
AT | 25.01.2017 | ||
CY | 25.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
MK | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
TR | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
GB | 04.08.2017 | ||
IE | 04.08.2017 | ||
LU | 04.08.2017 | ||
MT | 04.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 04.08.2010 | |
AT | 25.01.2017 | ||
CY | 25.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
MK | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
GB | 04.08.2017 | ||
IE | 04.08.2017 | ||
LU | 04.08.2017 | ||
MT | 04.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 04.08.2010 | |
AT | 25.01.2017 | ||
CY | 25.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
GB | 04.08.2017 | ||
IE | 04.08.2017 | ||
LU | 04.08.2017 | ||
MT | 04.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 04.08.2010 | |
AT | 25.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
GB | 04.08.2017 | ||
IE | 04.08.2017 | ||
LU | 04.08.2017 | ||
MT | 04.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
GB | 04.08.2017 | ||
IE | 04.08.2017 | ||
LU | 04.08.2017 | ||
MT | 04.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
GB | 04.08.2017 | ||
IE | 04.08.2017 | ||
LU | 04.08.2017 | ||
BE | 31.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
FR | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
GB | 04.08.2017 | ||
IE | 04.08.2017 | ||
LU | 04.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
IE | 04.08.2017 | ||
LU | 04.08.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.08.2017 | ||
LI | 31.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
ES | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
PL | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2009058278 (USHIKUBO TAKAHIRO [JP], et al); | [XY]US2009091255 (LEE SUNG-HOON [KR], et al); | [Y]WO2009070382 (UNIV MICHIGAN [US], et al) | International search | [Y]JP2000196140 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JP2004006165 (TOYOTA IND CORP); | [Y]JP2004221045 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO); | [Y]JP2004235168 (TOYOTA IND CORP); | [Y]JP2006173050 (NIPPON SEIKI CO LTD); | [Y]JP2007091721 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB); | [X]JP2007294261 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD, et al); | [X]JP2008198801 (FUJIFILM CORP) | Examination | WO2008102644 | US2010096622 | by applicant | JP2000196140 | JP2004006165 | JP2004221045 | JP2004235168 | JP2006173050 | JP2007091721 | JP2007294261 | JP2008198801 | US2009058278 | US2009091255 | WO2009070382 |