EP2593901 - SCAN ENGINE WITH INTEGRATED OBJECT SENSOR IN ELECTRO-OPTICAL READERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symbol Technologies, LLC One Zebra Plaza Holtsville, NY 11742 / US | [2016/26] |
Former [2013/21] | For all designated states Symbol Technologies, Inc. One Motorola Plaza Holtsville, NY 11742 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VINOGRADOV, Igor 3605 Wilshire Lane Oakdale New York 11769 / US | 02 /
BARKAN, Edward 3 Enchanted Woods Court Miller Place New York 11764 / US | 03 /
PANG, Robert 580 Concord Avenue Williston Park New York 11596 / US | [2013/21] | Representative(s) | LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf Patentanwalt Attorney at Law PartG mbB Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | Schäflein, Christian Georg Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10814786.9 | 30.12.2010 | [2016/27] | WO2010US62557 | Priority number, date | US20100834215 | 12.07.2010 Original published format: US 834215 | [2013/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012008985 | Date: | 19.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2593901 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2593901 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/10 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
G06K7/10792 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCANNER MIT INTEGRIERTEM OBJEKTSENSOR IN ELEKTROOPTISCHEN LESERN | [2013/21] | English: | SCAN ENGINE WITH INTEGRATED OBJECT SENSOR IN ELECTRO-OPTICAL READERS | [2013/21] | French: | MOTEUR DE BALAYAGE MUNI D'UN CAPTEUR D'OBJET INTÉGRÉ INSTALLÉ DANS LES LECTEURS ÉLECTRO-OPTIQUES | [2013/21] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/21] | 26.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.12.2010 | AL | 06.07.2016 | AT | 06.07.2016 | BE | 06.07.2016 | CY | 06.07.2016 | CZ | 06.07.2016 | DK | 06.07.2016 | EE | 06.07.2016 | ES | 06.07.2016 | FI | 06.07.2016 | HR | 06.07.2016 | LT | 06.07.2016 | LV | 06.07.2016 | MC | 06.07.2016 | MK | 06.07.2016 | NL | 06.07.2016 | PL | 06.07.2016 | RO | 06.07.2016 | RS | 06.07.2016 | SE | 06.07.2016 | SI | 06.07.2016 | SK | 06.07.2016 | SM | 06.07.2016 | TR | 06.07.2016 | BG | 06.10.2016 | NO | 06.10.2016 | GR | 07.10.2016 | IS | 06.11.2016 | PT | 07.11.2016 | IE | 30.12.2016 | LU | 30.12.2016 | MT | 30.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/43] | HU | 30.12.2010 | |
AT | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CY | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
MK | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
TR | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
IE | 30.12.2016 | ||
LU | 30.12.2016 | ||
MT | 30.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 30.12.2010 | |
AT | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CY | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
MK | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
TR | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
IE | 30.12.2016 | ||
LU | 30.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 30.12.2010 | |
AT | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CY | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
MK | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
IE | 30.12.2016 | ||
LU | 30.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
IE | 30.12.2016 | ||
LU | 30.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 06.07.2016 | |
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 06.07.2016 | |
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 06.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006180670 (ACOSTA JORGE L [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6,8-12,14-17,19,20 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0059]; figures 8,14 *; | [X]US5637854 (THOMAS JAMES E [US]) [X] 1,2,10,12,13 * column 4, line 8 - line 13; figure 2 *; | [XD]US5449891 (GIEBEL JAMES [US]) [XD] 1,10,12 * column 5, line 16 - line 18 * | by applicant | US4794239 | US5304786 | US5703349 | US4613895 | US5280162 | US5449891 |