EP2476057 - HARDWARE TRUST ANCHOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/29] | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONG, Zhexuan Fujitsu Laboratories of America Inc. 1240 E. Arques Avenue, Bldg. M3, M/S 345 Sunnyvale, California 94085-5401 / US | 02 /
MOLINA, Jesus Fujitsu Laboratories of America Inc. 1240 E. Arques Avenue, Bldg. M3, M/S Sunnyvale, California 94085-5401 / US | 03 /
GORDON, Joseph Fujitsu Laboratories of America Inc. 1240 E. Arques Avenue, Bldg. M3, M/S 345 Sunnyvale, California 94085-5401 / US | [2012/29] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/29] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10815793.4 | 28.07.2010 | WO2010US43550 | Priority number, date | US20090556148 | 09.09.2009 Original published format: US 556148 | [2012/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011031387 | Date: | 17.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2476057 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/00 | [2012/29] | CPC: |
H04L63/1433 (EP,US);
G06F21/53 (EP,US);
G06F21/552 (EP,US);
G06F21/57 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2105 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2149 (EP,US);
H04L63/145 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/29] | Title | German: | HARDWARE-SICHERHEITSANKER | [2012/29] | English: | HARDWARE TRUST ANCHOR | [2012/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ANCRAGE DE CONFIANCE DE MATÉRIEL | [2012/29] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/29] | 19.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2009063857 (BADE STEVEN A [US], et al); | [YP]US2009172781 (MASUOKA RYUSUKE [US], et al); | [A]US2009013406 (CABUK SERDAR [GB], et al); | [A]US2008141024 (RANGANATHAN KUMAR [US]); | [A]US7380119 (BADE STEVEN A [US], et al); | [A]US2008046758 (CHA INHYOK [US], et al); | [A]US7240202 (ORMAN HILARIE K [US]); | [A]US7131143 (LAMACCHIA BRIAN A [US], et al); | [A]US2005039016 (AISSI SELIM [US], et al); | [A]US2005033987 (YAN ZHENG [FI], et al); | [A] - BALDWIN ET AL., "Hardware Encapsulation of Security Services.", Lecture Notes in Computer Science: Computer Security - ESORICS 2003 8th European Symposium on Research in Computer Security [online], Gjovik, Norway, October 13-15, 2003 [retrieved on 2010-09-01], Proceedings, vol. 2808, pages 201 - 216, XP008150963 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-540-39650-5_12 | [A] - BALDW IN ET AL., "Hardware Security Appliances for Trust.", Lecture Notes in Computer Science: Trust Management, First International Conference [online], iTrust 2003 Heraklion, Crete, Greece, May 28-30, 2003 (retrieved on 2010-09-1], Proceedings, vol. 2692, pages 46 - 58, XP008150977 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-44875-6_4 |