EP2469748 - SIGNALING PROCESSING METHOD, BASE STATION AND USER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2018 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2017/47] |
Former [2012/26] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Xiaobo Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
YANG, Ruina Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/47] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/26] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10816697.6 | 15.09.2010 | [2017/47] | WO2010CN76934 | Priority number, date | CN20091092683 | 15.09.2009 Original published format: CN200910092683 | [2012/26] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011032493 | Date: | 24.03.2011 | Language: | ZH | [2011/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2469748 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2469748 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/16, H04L1/18 | [2012/41] | CPC: |
H04L1/1861 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04L1/1854 (EP,US);
H04L1/1893 (EP,US);
H04L5/14 (US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
|
Former IPC [2012/26] | H04L1/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SIGNALISIERUNGSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN SOWIE BASISSTATION UND BENUTZERVORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2012/26] | English: | SIGNALING PROCESSING METHOD, BASE STATION AND USER DEVICE | [2012/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNALISATION, STATION DE BASE ET DISPOSITIF D'UTILISATEUR | [2012/26] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2012 | Translation filed | 22.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 22.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/26] | 18.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17198032.9 / EP3340516 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.09.2010 | AL | 22.11.2017 | AT | 22.11.2017 | CY | 22.11.2017 | CZ | 22.11.2017 | DK | 22.11.2017 | EE | 22.11.2017 | ES | 22.11.2017 | FI | 22.11.2017 | HR | 22.11.2017 | IT | 22.11.2017 | LT | 22.11.2017 | LV | 22.11.2017 | MC | 22.11.2017 | MK | 22.11.2017 | NL | 22.11.2017 | PL | 22.11.2017 | PT | 22.11.2017 | RO | 22.11.2017 | SE | 22.11.2017 | SI | 22.11.2017 | SK | 22.11.2017 | SM | 22.11.2017 | TR | 22.11.2017 | BG | 22.02.2018 | NO | 22.02.2018 | GR | 23.02.2018 | IS | 22.03.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 15.09.2010 | |
AT | 22.11.2017 | ||
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
MK | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PT | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 15.09.2010 | |
AT | 22.11.2017 | ||
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PT | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 22.11.2017 | |
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]CN101409922 (ZTE CORP [CN]) [X] 1,2,5,8-11,13-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] - [0048] * [A] 6 [I] 3,4,7,12; | [XAI] - NOKIA ET AL, "DAI Design for TDD configuration #5 (9:1) in ACK/NACK Bundling", (20080630), pages 1 - 7, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 MEETING #53BIS R1-082615,, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_53b/Docs/, (20120830), XP008154740 [X] 1,2,11,15 * pages 1-3 * [A] 5,6,8-10,13,14 [I] 3,4,7,12 | [XAI] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Physical layer procedures (Release 8)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 36.213, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090501), no. V8.7.0, pages 1 - 81, XP050377562 [X] 1,2,5,8-11,13-15 * section 7.3 * * tables 7.3-X * [A] 6 [I] 3,4,7,12 | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Multiplexing and channel coding (Release 8)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 36.212, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090501), no. V8.7.0, pages 1 - 60, XP050377553 [A] 1-15 * sections 5.3.3.1.1-5.3.3.1.5 * | International search | [X]CN101409922 (ZTE CORP [CN]); | [A]CN101488832 (ZTE CORP [CN]); | [A]CN101505498 (ZTE CORP [CN]); | [Y] - NOKIA ET AL., "DAI Design for TDD configuration #5 (9:1) in ACK/NACK Bundling", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 MEETING #53BIS, (20080630), XP008154740 |