EP2481283 - ULTRA-LOW VOLUME SPRAYING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.08.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wui, Sung Soo 201-1104, Keumho2-cha Apartment Ssangmoon4-dong Dobong-gu Seoul 132-742 / KR | [2012/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/31] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/31] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 10817439.2 | 17.09.2010 | WO2010KR06399 | Priority number, date | KR20090088481 | 18.09.2009 Original published format: KR 20090088481 | KR20090112322 | 20.11.2009 Original published format: KR 20090112322 | [2012/31] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011034370 | Date: | 24.03.2011 | Language: | KO | [2011/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2481283 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A01M7/00, B05B7/12, B05B1/30 | [2012/31] | CPC: |
B05B7/2435 (EP,US);
A61L9/14 (EP,US);
B05B15/30 (EP,US);
B05B15/531 (EP,US);
B05B15/55 (EP,US);
B05B7/0012 (EP,US);
A61L2209/13 (EP,US);
B05B7/10 (EP,US);
B05B7/16 (EP,US);
B05B7/1613 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/31] | Title | German: | SPRÜHVORRICHTUNG MIT ULTRASCHWACHEM VOLUMEN | [2012/31] | English: | ULTRA-LOW VOLUME SPRAYING DEVICE | [2012/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PULVÉRISATION DE VOLUME ULTRA-RÉDUIT | [2012/31] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2012 | Translation filed | 13.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 22.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/38] | 30.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9507762 (ANDERSSON MICHAEL [SE]); | [A]JP2000117161 (ARIMITSU IND); | [A]KR200417919Y (LEE, JONG YUN); | [A]JPH08196949 (IWATA AIR COMPRESSOR MFG) |