EP2477724 - HIGH PRESSURE HIGH CO2 REMOVAL CONFIGURATIONS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fluor Technologies Corporation 3 Polaris Way Aliso Viejo, CA 92698 / US | [2012/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAK, John 2242 Salt Air Drive Santa Ana California 92705 / US | [2012/30] | Representative(s) | Dr. Graf & Partner AG Intellectual Property Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / SG / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/30] | Dr. Graf & Partner AG Intellectual Property Herrenacker 15 Postfach 518 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | Application number, filing date | 10817809.6 | 16.09.2010 | WO2010US49058 | Priority number, date | US20090243969P | 18.09.2009 Original published format: US 243969 P | [2012/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011034993 | Date: | 24.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2477724 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/14 | [2012/30] | CPC: |
B01D53/1475 (EP,US);
B01D53/1425 (EP,US);
B01D2256/245 (EP,US);
Y02C20/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/30] | Title | German: | KONFIGURATIONEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HOCHDRUCK-CO2-ENTFERNUNG | [2012/30] | English: | HIGH PRESSURE HIGH CO2 REMOVAL CONFIGURATIONS AND METHODS | [2012/30] | French: | CONFIGURATIONS ET PROCÉDÉS DE RETRAIT DE CO2 EN GRANDE QUANTITÉ ET À HAUTE PRESSION& xA; | [2012/30] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/30] | 23.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/02] | 25.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2826266 (HACHMUTH KARL H, et al) [A] 1,8 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6235961 (KURUKCHI SABAH A [US]) [A] 1,8,13 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2003155436 (NILSEN FINN PATRICK [NO], et al) [A] 1,8,13* claims 1,2,6,7,12,23,24 *; | [A]US2006150812 (MAK JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0002] , [0010] , [0011]; figure 2 *; | [A]WO2008103467 (FLUOR TECH CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,8 * figures 2-4 * | International search | [X]US3664091 (HEGWER ARNOLD M); | [Y]US4833171 (SWEENEY MAXWELL P [US]); | [Y]US2005172807 (MAK JOHN [US]) |