EP2355531 - IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE AND METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.09.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2011/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMASHITA, Noriyuki c/o N.Y. Real Laboratory 3-2-2 Nishi-nakanobu Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 142-0054 / JP | 02 /
HIRAI, Jun c/o PictNatural 34-7 Ohyama-cho Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0065 / JP | [2011/32] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/20] | Jackson, Jonathan Andrew, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2013/12] | Lewis, Darren John, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2011/32] | Haines, Miles John L.S. D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 10821919.7 | 01.10.2010 | [2011/32] | WO2010JP67198 | Priority number, date | JP20090235402 | 09.10.2009 Original published format: JP 2009235402 | [2011/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011043248 | Date: | 14.04.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2355531 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/02, G03B35/02 | [2011/32] | CPC: |
G03B35/02 (EP,US);
G06T3/4038 (EP,US);
H04N13/128 (EP,US);
H04N13/139 (EP,US);
H04N13/221 (EP,US);
H04N23/698 (EP,US);
H04N13/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/32] | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN SOWIE PROGRAMM | [2011/32] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE AND METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2011/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, ET PROGRAMME | [2011/32] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2011 | Translation filed | 01.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2011 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 28.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/41] | 29.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9008343 (SANDIN DANIEL J [US], et al) [Y] 4 * abstract * * page 2, line 3 - line 20 *; | [Y]WO9701135 (SARNOFF DAVID RES CENTER [US]) [Y] 5 * abstract ** page 3, line 20 - line 33 *; | [XY]WO9925120 (BANITT SHMUEL [IL], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7 * abstract * * figure 3 * * page 2, line 22 - page 3, line 8 * * page 8, line 9 - line 15 * * page 9, line 3 - line 7 * * page 9, line 12 - line 15 * * page 9, line 9 - line 12 * [Y] 4,5 | International search | [Y]JP2003524927 (YISSUM RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT COMPANY OF THE HEBREW UNIVERSITY OF JERUSA); | [A]JP2005529559 (RAFAEL-ARMAMENT DEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY LTD.); | [Y]JP2006014129 (TIDE DESIGN INC); | [Y]JP2009103980 (FUJIFILM CORP) | by applicant | JP3168443B |