EP2487897 - SEMICONDUCTOR ELEMENT AND SOLID-STATE IMAGING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2017 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National University Corporation Shizuoka University 836, Ohya Suruga-ku Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 422-8529 / JP | [2016/37] |
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states National University Corporation Shizuoka University 836, Ohya Suruga-ku Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 422-8529 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAHITO, Shoji c/o National University Corporation Shizuoka University Research Institute of Electronics 5-1 Johoku 3-chome, Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 432-8561 / JP | 02 /
SAWADA, Tomonari c/o National University Corporation Shizuoka University Research Institute of Electronics 5-1 Johoku 3-chome, Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 432-8561 / JP | [2012/33] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/37] |
Former [2012/33] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10822009.6 | 05.10.2010 | [2016/37] | WO2010JP67452 | Priority number, date | JP20090231587 | 05.10.2009 Original published format: JP 2009231587 | [2012/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011043339 | Date: | 14.04.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2487897 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2487897 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/335, H01L27/146, G01S7/481, H04N5/359, H04N5/3745, G01S7/486 | [2014/10] | CPC: |
H01L27/14609 (EP,US);
H01L27/146 (KR);
G01S7/4816 (EP,US);
G01S7/4863 (EP,US);
H01L27/14603 (EP,US);
H01L27/14607 (EP,US);
H01L27/14612 (EP,US);
H01L27/14656 (EP,US);
H04N25/00 (KR);
H04N25/62 (EP,US);
H04N25/75 (EP,US);
H04N25/771 (EP,US);
G01S17/894 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/33] | H04N5/335, H01L27/146 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALBLEITERELEMENT UND FESTKÖRPERBILDAUFNAHMEVORRICHTUNG | [2012/33] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR ELEMENT AND SOLID-STATE IMAGING DEVICE | [2012/33] | French: | ÉLÉMENT À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR ET DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2012/33] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2012 | Translation filed | 03.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 03.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 03.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/33] | 07.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.10.2010 | AL | 14.09.2016 | AT | 14.09.2016 | BE | 14.09.2016 | CY | 14.09.2016 | CZ | 14.09.2016 | DK | 14.09.2016 | EE | 14.09.2016 | ES | 14.09.2016 | FI | 14.09.2016 | HR | 14.09.2016 | IT | 14.09.2016 | LT | 14.09.2016 | LV | 14.09.2016 | MC | 14.09.2016 | MK | 14.09.2016 | NL | 14.09.2016 | PL | 14.09.2016 | RO | 14.09.2016 | RS | 14.09.2016 | SE | 14.09.2016 | SI | 14.09.2016 | SK | 14.09.2016 | SM | 14.09.2016 | TR | 14.09.2016 | IE | 05.10.2016 | LU | 05.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | MT | 31.10.2016 | FR | 14.11.2016 | BG | 14.12.2016 | GB | 14.12.2016 | NO | 14.12.2016 | GR | 15.12.2016 | IS | 14.01.2017 | PT | 16.01.2017 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 05.10.2010 | |
AT | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
MK | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
TR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 05.10.2016 | ||
LU | 05.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 14.11.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GB | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 05.10.2010 | |
AT | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
MK | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
TR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 05.10.2016 | ||
LU | 05.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 14.11.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GB | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 05.10.2010 | |
AT | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
MK | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 05.10.2016 | ||
LU | 05.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 14.11.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GB | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
IE | 05.10.2016 | ||
LU | 05.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 14.11.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
GB | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
LU | 05.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 14.11.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 14.11.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
DK | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
FR | 14.11.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
ES | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
IT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
BE | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
PL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
NL | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 14.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2008004692 (NIKON CORP) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0037]; figures 1,3,4,5,6 *; | [X]JP2008103647 (UNIV SHIZUOKA NAT UNIV CORP) [X] 1,2,4,6,10,13-15 * figures 1,17,18 *; | [E]EP2487714 (UNIV SHIZUOKA NAT UNIV CORP [JP]) [E] 1,2,4,6-8,10,13-15 * figures 1, 8a-8c * | International search | [Y]JP2001326341 (NEC CORP); | [Y]JP2008103647 (UNIV SHIZUOKA NAT UNIV CORP); | [Y]JP2008252814 (UNIV SHIZUOKA NAT UNIV CORP) |