EP2487639 - INFORMATION MANAGEMENT DEVICE, DATA PROCESSING METHOD THEREOF, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2012/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYAKAWA, Shinya c/o NEC Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2012/33] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10822088.0 | 07.10.2010 | WO2010JP67646 | Priority number, date | JP20090234897 | 09.10.2009 Original published format: JP 2009234897 | [2012/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011043418 | Date: | 14.04.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2487639 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/00, G06F17/30, G06Q10/00, G06F21/62, H04W12/02, H04W4/02, G06F17/27 | [2017/21] | CPC: |
G06Q10/00 (EP,US);
G06F16/219 (US);
G06F21/6254 (EP,US);
G06F40/205 (US);
H04W12/02 (EP,US);
H04W4/025 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/33] | G06Q50/00, G06F17/30, G06Q10/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/33] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERWALTUNGSVORRICHTUNG, DATENVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM | [2012/33] | English: | INFORMATION MANAGEMENT DEVICE, DATA PROCESSING METHOD THEREOF, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM | [2012/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GESTION D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES ASSOCIÉ ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE | [2012/33] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2012 | Translation filed | 03.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 03.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/33] | 23.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/21] | 08.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006123462 (LUNT TERESA F [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0010] , [0 25] - [0062] - [0 90] - [0102] *; | [A]US2007281689 (ALTMAN SAMUEL H [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0005] , [0 31] - [0033] - [0 60] - [0078] *; | [A] - LING LIU ET AL, "PRIVACYGRID: Supporting Anonymous Location Queries in Mobile Environments", INTERNET CITATION, (2007), pages 1 - 16, URL: http://smartech.gatech.edu/handle/1853/20111, (20080903), XP002494562 [A] 1-13 * Section 1 and 2 * | International search | [A]JP2005234866 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JP2005244547 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JP2005531263 (QUALCOMM INC.); | [A]WO2008108158 (NEC CORP [JP], et al); | [A] - TAKUYA MORI ET AL., "Report on Behavior Modeling and its Impact to Privaciness", DAI 71 KAI (HEISEI 21 NEN) ZENKOKU TAIKAI KOEN RONBUNSHU (3) NETWORK SECURITY, DAI 71 KAI (HEISEI 21 NEN) ZENKOKU TAIKAI, (20090310), page 3-345-346, XP008151200 | by applicant | JP2004029940 | JP2004318391 | JP2005031965 | JP2005234866 | JP2005346248 | JP2007179500 | JP2007219636 | JP2009234897 |