EP2483342 - COLORANT COMPATIBLE OXYGEN SCAVENGING POLYMER COMPOSITIONS AND ARTICLES MADE FROM SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plastipak Packaging, Inc. 41605 Ann Arbor Road Plymouth, MI 48170 / US | [2015/09] |
Former [2014/42] | For all designated states Constar International LLC 1100 Northbrook Drive 2nd Floor Trevose, PA 19053 / US | ||
Former [2014/40] | For all designated states Constar International Inc. One Crown Way Philadelphia, PA 19154-4599 / US | ||
Former [2012/32] | For all designated states Constar International 11535 South Central Avenue Alsip, IL 60803 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESHPANDE, Girish, N. 1133 Jennifer Lane Bolingbrook IL 60440 / US | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | Gordon, Jennifer Claire Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2017/08] |
Former [2012/32] | Campbell, Neil Boyd Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10822439.5 | 29.09.2010 | [2017/08] | WO2010US50719 | Priority number, date | US20090246956P | 29.09.2009 Original published format: US 246956 P | [2012/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011043969 | Date: | 14.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2483342 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2483342 | Date: | 22.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.08.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/20, C08K13/02, C08L67/02, C08J5/18, B29C49/02 | [2013/35] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP,US);
B29C49/0005 (EP,US);
C08L67/02 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0715 (EP);
B29C49/04 (EP,US);
B29C49/06 (EP,US);
B29C49/0691 (EP,US);
B29C51/002 (EP,US);
B65D11/00 (US);
C08J2367/02 (EP,US);
C08K3/013 (EP,US);
C08K5/0041 (EP,US);
C08K5/098 (EP,US);
C08K5/101 (EP,US);
C08K5/20 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L2666/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/32] | C08K5/20, C08K13/02, C08L67/00, C08J5/18, B29C49/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÄRBEMITTELKOMPATIBLE SAUERSTOFFABSORBIERENDE POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE ARTIKEL | [2012/32] | English: | COLORANT COMPATIBLE OXYGEN SCAVENGING POLYMER COMPOSITIONS AND ARTICLES MADE FROM SAME | [2012/32] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE POLYMÈRE INACTIVEUR D'OXYGÈNE COMPATIBLES AVEC UN COLORANT ET ARTICLES FABRIQUÉS À PARTIR DE CELLES-CI | [2012/32] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 28.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   07.11.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.09.2010 | AL | 22.02.2017 | AT | 22.02.2017 | CY | 22.02.2017 | CZ | 22.02.2017 | DK | 22.02.2017 | EE | 22.02.2017 | FI | 22.02.2017 | HR | 22.02.2017 | LT | 22.02.2017 | LV | 22.02.2017 | MC | 22.02.2017 | MK | 22.02.2017 | RO | 22.02.2017 | SE | 22.02.2017 | SI | 22.02.2017 | SK | 22.02.2017 | SM | 22.02.2017 | BG | 22.05.2017 | NO | 22.05.2017 | GR | 23.05.2017 | IS | 22.06.2017 | PT | 22.06.2017 | IE | 29.09.2017 | MT | 29.09.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/52] | HU | 29.09.2010 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MK | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
IE | 29.09.2017 | ||
MT | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 29.09.2010 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
IE | 29.09.2017 | ||
MT | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 29.09.2010 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
IE | 29.09.2017 | ||
MT | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
IE | 29.09.2017 | ||
MT | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
IE | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
GR | 23.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2009152114 (CONSTAR INT INC [US], et al) | International search | [A]US5639815 (COCHRAN MICHAEL ALEXANDER [GB], et al); | [A]US6780916 (TUNG DEBORAH [US], et al); | [A]US2006180790 (DESHPANDE GIRISH N [US], et al); | [A]US2006182911 (TAMMAJI KULKARNI S [IN], et al); | [A]US2008161472 (JENKINS JASON CHRISTOPHER [US], et al); | [A]US2009030115 (LIU ZHENGUO [US]); | [AP]WO2009152114 (CONSTAR INT INC [US], et al) |