EP2490209 - DISPLAY DRIVING CIRCUIT, DISPLAY DEVICE, AND DISPLAY DRIVING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURUTA, Shige c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO, Etsuo c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 03 /
MURAKAMI, Yuhichiroh c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 04 /
GYOUTEN, Seijirou c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2012/34] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10823223.2 | 04.06.2010 | WO2010JP59547 | Priority number, date | JP20090239763 | 16.10.2009 Original published format: JP 2009239763 | [2012/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011045955 | Date: | 21.04.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2490209 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36, G02F1/133, G09G3/20 | [2012/34] | CPC: |
G09G3/3614 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0267 (US);
G09G3/3655 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/34] | Title | German: | ANZEIGENANTRIEBSSCHALTUNG, ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND ANZEIGENANTRIEBSVERFAHREN | [2012/34] | English: | DISPLAY DRIVING CIRCUIT, DISPLAY DEVICE, AND DISPLAY DRIVING METHOD | [2012/34] | French: | CIRCUIT D'ATTAQUE DE DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE, DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ATTAQUE DE DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2012/34] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2012 | Translation filed | 12.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/34] | 10.03.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH07230077 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JP2006145923 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [Y]WO2008114479 (SHARP KK [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2009069562 (EPSON IMAGING DEVICES CORP); | [A]JPH07146666 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]JPS62138893 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [A]JP2009075225 (EPSON IMAGING DEVICES CORP) | by applicant | JP2001083943 |