EP2490010 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MEASURING MOLECULAR COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kowa Company, Ltd. 6-29, Nishiki 3-chome Naka-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 460-8625 / JP | [2012/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRONO Taisuke c/o KOWA COMPANY LTD. Hamamatsu Factory 1-3-1 Shinmiyakoda Kita-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 431-2103 / JP | [2012/34] | Representative(s) | Kronthaler, Wolfgang N.K. Kronthaler, Schmidt & Coll. Patentanwälte Pfarrstrasse 14 80538 München / DE | [2012/34] | Application number, filing date | 10823273.7 | 22.09.2010 | WO2010JP66401 | Priority number, date | JP20090236777 | 14.10.2009 Original published format: JP 2009236777 | [2012/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011046005 | Date: | 21.04.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2490010 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/117, A61B3/10, G01N33/68, G01N21/39, G01N21/51 | [2014/28] | CPC: |
A61B3/10 (EP,US);
G01N21/39 (EP,US);
G01N21/51 (EP,US);
G01N2021/399 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/34] | G01N21/47, A61B3/117, G01N33/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/34] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DER MOLEKULAREN ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2012/34] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MEASURING MOLECULAR COMPOSITION | [2012/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR MESURER UNE COMPOSITION MOLÉCULAIRE | [2012/34] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2012 | Translation filed | 13.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/34] | 13.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/30] | 17.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1022549 (EUROP AGENCE SPATIALE [FR]) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0055] * * figures 2, 9 *; | [X]US2008088795 (GOLDSTEIN LEE E [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0113] - paragraph [0116] * * paragraph [0125] - paragraph [0127] *; | [X]US2002091321 (GOLDSTEIN LEE E [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0105] * * figures 3a, 4 *; | [X]US5908394 (KANDEL GILLRAY L [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 5 * * column 9, line 1 - line 11 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0516272 (KOWA CO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 1 - line 24 * | International search | [A]JPH04352933 (KOWA CO); | [A]JPH0933433 (KIRIN BREWERY); | [A]JP2007057383 (SYSMEX CORP); | [A]JP2004191182 (OLYMPUS CORP) | by applicant | JPH04352933 |