EP2489636 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING DDR ZEOLITE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2012/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UCHIKAWA, Tetsuya c/o NGK INSULATORS LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 02 /
NIINO, Makiko c/o NGK INSULATORS LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2012/34] | Representative(s) | Naylor, Matthew John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [2017/44] |
Former [2012/34] | Naylor, Matthew John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 10823284.4 | 28.09.2010 | [2017/44] | WO2010JP66778 | Priority number, date | JP20090239752 | 16.10.2009 Original published format: JP 2009239752 | [2012/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011046016 | Date: | 21.04.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2489636 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2489636 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C01B39/48, C01B37/02, B01D67/00, B01D53/14, B01D53/22, B01D61/36, B01D69/10, B01D71/02, C01B39/06 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
B01D67/0051 (EP,US);
C01B39/06 (US);
B01D53/14 (US);
B01D69/10 (EP,US);
B01D71/0281 (EP,US);
C01B37/02 (EP,US);
C01B39/48 (EP,US);
B01D2253/108 (US);
B01D2323/081 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/34] | C01B39/48, C01B37/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DDR-ZEOLITH | [2012/34] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING DDR ZEOLITE | [2012/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE ZÉOLITE DE TYPE DDR | [2012/34] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2012 | Translation filed | 04.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/34] | 29.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.09.2010 | AL | 01.11.2017 | AT | 01.11.2017 | CY | 01.11.2017 | CZ | 01.11.2017 | DK | 01.11.2017 | EE | 01.11.2017 | ES | 01.11.2017 | FI | 01.11.2017 | HR | 01.11.2017 | IT | 01.11.2017 | LT | 01.11.2017 | LV | 01.11.2017 | MC | 01.11.2017 | MK | 01.11.2017 | NL | 01.11.2017 | PL | 01.11.2017 | PT | 01.11.2017 | RO | 01.11.2017 | SE | 01.11.2017 | SI | 01.11.2017 | SK | 01.11.2017 | SM | 01.11.2017 | TR | 01.11.2017 | BG | 01.02.2018 | NO | 01.02.2018 | GR | 02.02.2018 | IS | 01.03.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 28.09.2010 | |
AT | 01.11.2017 | ||
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
MK | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PT | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
TR | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 28.09.2010 | |
AT | 01.11.2017 | ||
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PT | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
TR | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
TR | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 01.11.2017 | |
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO03024577 ; | [XI]WO2009113715 ; | JP2004066188 [ ] (NGK INSULATORS LTD); | [XI]EP1995215 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]); | US2010298115 [ ] (YAJIMA KENJI [JP], et al); | International search | [A]JP2004083375 (NGK INSULATORS LTD); | [X]WO2007105407 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2008018387 (NGK INSULATORS LTD) | by applicant | JP2004083375 | JP2005067991 |