EP2489012 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CODING A THREE DIMENSIONAL MESH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | For all designated states Korea University Industrial & Academic Collaboration Foundation Korea University Anam-dong 5-ga Seongbuk-gu Seoul 136-701 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2012/34] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | ||
For all designated states Korea University Industrial & Academic Collaboration Foundation Korea University Anam-dong 5-ga Seongbuk-gu Seoul 136-701 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AHN, Min Su c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology Mt. 14-1 Nongseo-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 449-712 / KR | 02 /
AHN, Jeong Hwan c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology Mt. 14-1 Nongseo-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 449-712 / KR | 03 /
AHN, Jae Kyun c/o Korea University Industrial&Academic Collaboration Korea Univ. Anam-dong 5-ga, Seongbuk-gu Seoul 136-701 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Dae Youn c/o Korea University Industrial&Academic Collaboration Korea Univ. Anam-dong 5-ga, Seongbuk-gu Seoul 136-701 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Chang Su c/o Korea University Industrial&Academic Collaboration Korea Univ. Anam-dong 5-ga, Seongbuk-gu Seoul 136-701 / KR | [2012/34] | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2013/29] | D'Halleweyn, Nele Veerle Trees Gertrudis, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2012/34] | Beck, Michaël Andries T Arnold Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 10823566.4 | 11.10.2010 | WO2010KR06928 | Priority number, date | KR20090098952 | 16.10.2009 Original published format: KR 20090098952 | KR20100034488 | 14.04.2010 Original published format: KR 20100034488 | [2012/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011046327 | Date: | 21.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2489012 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.08.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06T9/00 | [2013/29] | CPC: |
G06T9/001 (EP,US);
G06T17/20 (EP,KR,US);
G06T17/00 (KR);
G06T17/205 (EP,US);
G06T9/00 (EP,US);
H04N7/24 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2012/34] | G06T17/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/34] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERSCHLÜSSELUNG EINES DREIDIMENSIONALEN NETZES | [2012/34] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CODING A THREE DIMENSIONAL MESH | [2012/34] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE D'UN MAILLAGE TRIDIMENSIONNEL | [2012/34] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 19.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/34] | 06.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.03.2024 | 12.03.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.09.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7003169 (LECHAT PATRICK M [FR], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [XI] - M. CURIL; D. S. IONESCU; S. CURIL; G. C. IONESCU, "Karhunen-Loève Transform for Geometry Compression of 3D Mesh", ACTA ELECTROTEHNICA, (2006), vol. 47, no. 2, ISSN 1841-3323, pages 73 - 78, XP002698456 [X] 1,4,6,12 * the whole document * [I] 2,3,5,7-11,13-15 | International search | [A]US2002063707 (KAWANAKA AKIRA [JP]); | [A]KR20050006323 (SEOUL NAT UNIVERSITY IN KOREA); | [A]US2007194975 (JANG EUEE-SEON [KR], et al) |