EP2489127 - HIGH UTILIZATION UNIVERSAL LOGIC ARRAY WITH VARIABLE CIRCUIT TOPOLOGY AND LOGISTIC MAP CIRCUIT TO REALIZE A VARIETY OF LOGIC GATES WITH CONSTANT POWER SIGNATURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chaologix, Inc. 101 SE 2nd Place Gainesville, FL 32601 / US | [2022/48] |
Former [2012/34] | For all designated states Chaologix, Inc. 101 SE 2nd Place Gainesville, FL 32601 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MYERS, Brent, A. 228 Neville Circle N.E. Palm Bay FL 32907 / US | 02 /
FOX, James, G. 211 Melbourne Avenue Indialantic FL 32903 / US | [2012/34] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/48] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2013/16] | Finnie, Peter John Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | ||
Former [2012/34] | Bruce, Alexander Richard Henry Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10824014.4 | 13.10.2010 | [2022/48] | WO2010US52489 | Priority number, date | US20100358664P | 25.06.2010 Original published format: US 358664 P | US20090251519P | 14.10.2009 Original published format: US 251519 P | [2012/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011047035 | Date: | 21.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2489127 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2489127 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.07.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/17704, H03K19/17728, H03K19/17768, G06F21/75, H03K19/00, H03K19/0944, H03K19/20, H04L9/00 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
H03K19/17768 (EP,KR,US);
G06F21/755 (EP,US);
H03K19/0013 (EP,KR,US);
H03K19/0944 (EP,KR,US);
H03K19/17704 (EP,KR,US);
H03K19/17728 (EP,US);
H03K19/20 (EP,US);
H04L9/001 (EP,US);
H04L9/003 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/36] | H03K19/173, H03K19/00, G06F21/55, H03K19/177, H03K19/0944, H03K19/20, H04L9/00 | ||
Former IPC [2012/34] | H03K19/173, H03K19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNIVERSELLES LOGIKARRAY VON HOHER VERWENDBARKEIT MIT VARIABLER SCHALTUNGSTOPOLOGIE UND LOGISTIKZUORDUNGSSCHALTUNG ZUR ERSTELLUNG VERSCHIEDENER LOGIKGATES MIT KONSTANTEN LEISTUNGSSIGNATUREN | [2012/34] | English: | HIGH UTILIZATION UNIVERSAL LOGIC ARRAY WITH VARIABLE CIRCUIT TOPOLOGY AND LOGISTIC MAP CIRCUIT TO REALIZE A VARIETY OF LOGIC GATES WITH CONSTANT POWER SIGNATURES | [2012/34] | French: | RÉSEAU PRÉDIFFUSÉ DE PORTES UNIVERSEL À USAGE INTENSIF À TOPOLOGIE DE CIRCUIT VARIABLE ET CIRCUIT À SUITE LOGISTIQUE POUR RÉALISER UNE PLURALITÉ DE PORTES LOGIQUES AVEC DES SIGNATURES DE PUISSANCE CONSTANTE | [2012/34] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/34] | 08.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.03.2019 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 30.11.2022 | AT | 30.11.2022 | CZ | 30.11.2022 | DK | 30.11.2022 | EE | 30.11.2022 | ES | 30.11.2022 | FI | 30.11.2022 | HR | 30.11.2022 | IT | 30.11.2022 | LT | 30.11.2022 | LV | 30.11.2022 | MC | 30.11.2022 | NL | 30.11.2022 | PL | 30.11.2022 | RO | 30.11.2022 | RS | 30.11.2022 | SE | 30.11.2022 | SI | 30.11.2022 | SK | 30.11.2022 | SM | 30.11.2022 | NO | 28.02.2023 | GR | 01.03.2023 | IS | 30.03.2023 | PT | 31.03.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
IT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 30.11.2022 | |
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 30.11.2022 | |
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 30.11.2022 | |
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
NO | 28.02.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 30.11.2022 | |
NO | 28.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005029704 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1* figure 6 * | International search | [A]US5517139 (CHUNG HO-SUN [KR], et al); | [A]US2006200514 (FISCHER WIELAND [DE], et al); | [A]JP2007532985 (DITTO ET AL.); | [A]WO2008050938 (INHA IND PARTNERSHIP INST [KR], et al); | [A]US2008150578 (KIEL STEVEN LEE [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2005029704 |