EP2489004 - APPARATUSES, METHODS, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCTS ENABLING ASSOCIATION OF RELATED PRODUCT DATA AND EXECUTION OF TRANSACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2015 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ezsav Inc. P.O. Box 931 Darien, CT 06820 / US | [2012/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Lehmann P.O. Box 931 Darien, CT 06820 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | 01 /
LI, Lehmann P.O. Box 40024 Studio City California 91614 / US | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Lane, Cathal Michael, et al 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 10824018.5 | 13.10.2010 | WO2010US52497 | Priority number, date | US20090251284P | 13.10.2009 Original published format: US 251284 P | US20100304636P | 15.02.2010 Original published format: US 304636 P | US20100321870P | 07.04.2010 Original published format: US 321870 P | [2012/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011047041 | Date: | 21.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2489004 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00 | [2012/34] | CPC: |
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/34] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN, VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKTE ZUR ZUORDNUNG ENTSPRECHENDER PRODUKTDATEN UND ZUR AUSFÜHRUNG VON TRANSAKTIONEN | [2012/34] | English: | APPARATUSES, METHODS, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCTS ENABLING ASSOCIATION OF RELATED PRODUCT DATA AND EXECUTION OF TRANSACTION | [2012/34] | French: | APPAREILS, PROCÉDÉS ET PRODUITS DE PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR PERMETTANT L'ASSOCIATION DE DONNÉES DE PRODUIT LIÉES ET L'EXÉCUTION DE TRANSACTION | [2012/34] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 09.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/34] | 08.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/03] | 16.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   04.05.2015 | 31.10.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US2008290987 (LI LEHMANN [US]); | [Y]US2007271150 (ABBOTT HARISH [US]); | [A]US2009157471 (BURGESS JR ANDREW L [US], et al); | [A]US2005004831 (NAJMI ADEEL [US], et al) |