EP2489119 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MONITORING WIND TURBINE OPERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baker, Myles L. 100 East San Antonio Drive Long Beach, CA 90807 / US | For all designated states Arendt, Cory P. 16861 Phelps Lane Huntington Beach, CA 92649 / US | For all designated states Dahlin, Andrew 4035 Livingston Avenue, 3 Long Beach, CA 90803 / US | For all designated states Mostoufi, Mehrdad 4025 E. Ransom Street Long Beach, CA 90804 / US | For all designated states Roughen, Kevin M. 1202 Tennyson Street 3 Manhattan Beach, CA 90266 / US | [2012/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/34] | Representative(s) | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10824050.8 | 13.10.2010 | WO2010US52558 | Priority number, date | US20090251229P | 13.10.2009 Original published format: US 251229 P | US20100384675P | 20.09.2010 Original published format: US 384675 P | [2012/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011047089 | Date: | 21.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2489119 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02P9/04, F03D7/04, G01M5/00 | [2014/22] | CPC: |
F03D7/047 (EP,US);
G01M5/0016 (EP,US);
F05B2260/74 (EP,US);
F05B2260/80 (EP,US);
F05B2270/1095 (EP,US);
F05B2270/331 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/34] | H02P9/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/34] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DES WINDTURBINENBETRIEBS | [2012/34] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MONITORING WIND TURBINE OPERATION | [2012/34] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR SURVEILLER LE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE ÉOLIENNE | [2012/34] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 02.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/34] | 23.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/46] | 18.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004151577 (PIERCE KIRK [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 1,4,8,9 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0017] , [0019] , [0022] - [0028] - [0034] - [0036] - [0041] - [0046] *; | [Y]US2007132247 (GALAYDA STEPHEN [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * figures 1,3,8-11 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0009] - [0011] - [0032] , [0045] - [0052] - [0062] - [0065] *; | [A]US7218012 (EDENFELD THOMAS [DE]) [A] 1-12 * figures 1-9 * * column 1, line 31 - column 2, line 7 * * column 3, line 44 - column 6, line 4 * * column 7, line 22 - line 33 * | International search | [Y]US2004151577 (PIERCE KIRK [US], et al); | [Y]US2009185658 (KATCHA JASON STUART [US], et al); | [A]US2008296903 (TODOROF BILL [US]); | [A]WO2008074866 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK], et al); | [A]US2007013193 (GALLOWAY DUDLEY L [US], et al) |