EP2492993 - LITHIUM PRIMARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.10.2014 [2014/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Fumio c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC, IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61 Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
NUNOME, Jun c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC, IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61 Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
FUKUHARA, Yoshiki c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC, IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61 Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
SHIMIZU, Toshiyuki c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC, IP Development Center 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61 Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2012/35] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10824608.3 | 28.09.2010 | WO2010JP05821 | Priority number, date | JP20090241050 | 20.10.2009 Original published format: JP 2009241050 | [2012/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011048753 | Date: | 28.04.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2492993 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/06, H01M6/14, H01M4/58, H01M4/62, // H01M4/66, H01M4/80, H01M4/74 | [2013/41] | CPC: |
H01M4/5815 (EP,US);
H01M4/06 (EP,US);
H01M4/625 (EP,US);
H01M4/661 (EP,US);
H01M4/808 (EP,US);
H01M6/14 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/35] | H01M4/06, H01M4/58, H01M4/62, H01M4/74 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/35] | Title | German: | LITHIUMPRIMÄRBATTERIE | [2012/35] | English: | LITHIUM PRIMARY BATTERY | [2012/35] | French: | BATTERIE PRIMAIRE AU LITHIUM | [2012/35] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2012 | Translation filed | 16.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/35] | 05.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/44] | 02.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2006127872 (DOWA MINING CO) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 2] , [0 25] , [0 34] *; | [A]US2008233467 (ISSAEV NIKOLAI N [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0054] , [0 70] , [0 71] *; | [A]US2009104520 (MARPLE JACK W [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0083] , [0 84] , [ 100] , [ 101] , [ 102]; table 1 (paragraph 100) * | International search | [X]JP2006127872 (DOWA MINING CO); | [Y]JP2005038730 (YUASA BATTERY CO LTD); | [Y]WO2008013854 (EVEREADY BATTERY INC [US], et al); | [Y]JPS63167671U (SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD.); | [Y]JPH08171901 (CANON KK [JP]); | [Y]JP2006190514 (NIKKO METAL MFG CO LTD, et al); | [Y]WO2008109722 (GILLETTE CO [US], et al); | [Y]WO2009001246 (GILLETTE CO [US], et al); | [A]JP2009123410 (PANASONIC CORP); | [A]JPS61216243 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO); | [A]JP2007109526 (SONY CORP); | [A]JPS6445057 (TOSHIBA BATTERY) | by applicant | JP2008525960 | JP2006100164 |