EP2491425 - 3D-TRENCH ELECTRODE DETECTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.09.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.10.2015 [2015/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brookhaven Science Associates LLC 40 Brookhaven Avenue P.O. Box 5000 - Bldg. 460 Upton, New York 11973-5000 / US | [2012/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Zheng 30 Hancock Court South Setauket, New York 11720 / US | [2012/35] | Representative(s) | Oslo Patentkontor AS Hoffsveien 1A 0275 Oslo / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2014/03] | Oslo Patentkontor AS P.O. Box 7007M 0306 Oslo / NO | ||
Former [2012/35] | Smedseng, Øyvind, et al Oslo Patentkontor AS P.O. Box 7007 M 0306 Oslo / NO | Application number, filing date | 10825446.7 | 15.10.2010 | WO2010US52887 | Priority number, date | US20090252756P | 19.10.2009 Original published format: US 252756 P | [2012/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011049832 | Date: | 28.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2491425 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/24, H01L21/02 | [2012/35] | CPC: |
H01L31/117 (EP,US);
H01L27/1446 (EP,US);
H01L31/03529 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/35] | Title | German: | 3D-GRABEN-ELEKTRODENDETEKTOREN | [2012/35] | English: | 3D-TRENCH ELECTRODE DETECTORS | [2012/35] | French: | DÉTECTEURS D'ÉLECTRODE À TRANCHÉE TRIDIMENSIONNELLE | [2012/35] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 21.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/35] | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/42] | 28.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS5396784 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO); | [A]US6037595 (LINGREN CLINTON L [US]); | [A]US2007045554 (WAKAMATSU SHUNSUKE [JP], et al); | [A]US2007290142 (DU YANFENG [US], et al) |