EP2405783 - LUGGAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/03] | LUGGAGE PANEL WITH INTEGRATED CARRY HANDLE FOR SOFT-SIDE TYPE LUGGAGE CASES | ||
[2013/09] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 06.02.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsonite IP Holdings S.a.r.l 13-15 Avenue de la Liberté 1931 Luxembourg / LU | [2013/17] |
Former [2012/03] | For all designated states Samsonite IP Holdings S.a.r.l 13-15 Avenue de la Liberté 1931 Luxembourg / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANTY, Dirk Moerestraat, 107 B-8680 Koekelare / BE | 02 /
SMEUNINX, Joris HAM 69 B-9000 Gent / BE | 03 /
TEIXEIRA, George 31 Long Lane Warren RI 02885 / US | 04 /
YONENO, Kenzo The Bonham Mansion, No. 4A 63 Bonham Road Mid-Levels West Hong Kong SAR / CN | [2012/08] |
Former [2012/03] | 01 /
Dirk Santy Westerring 17 Koekalare 9700 Oudenaarde / BE | ||
02 /
Joris Smeuninx Westerring 17 Koekelare 9700 Oudenaarde / BE | |||
03 /
George Teixeira 31 Long Lane Warren RI 02885 / US | |||
04 /
Kenzo Yoneno 13F Axa Centre 151 Gloucester Road Hong Kong / CN | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/03] | Miller, James Lionel Woolverton, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10825624.9 | 20.10.2010 | WO2010US53429 | Priority number, date | US20090253242P | 20.10.2009 Original published format: US 253242 P | [2012/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011050101 | Date: | 28.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2405783 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2405783 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A45C7/00, A45C5/14, A45C13/26 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
A45C13/26 (EP,US);
A45C5/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/03] | A45C7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEPÄCK | [2013/09] | English: | LUGGAGE | [2013/11] | French: | BAGAGE | [2013/09] |
Former [2012/03] | GEPÄCKWAGENWAND MIT INTEGRIERTEM TRAGEGRIFF FÜR GEPÄCKWAGEN MIT WEICHER SEITENWAND | ||
Former [2012/03] | LUGGAGE PANEL WITH INTEGRATED CARRY HANDLE FOR SOFT-SIDE TYPE LUGGAGE CASES | ||
Former [2012/03] | PANNEAU DE BAGAGE AVEC POIGNÉE DE PORTAGE INTÉGRÉE POUR ENCEINTES DE BAGAGE DU TYPE À CÔTÉS SOUPLES | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 16.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/03] | 19.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2013 | Observations by third parties | 07.05.2014 | Observations by third parties | Divisional application(s) | EP13002141.3 / EP2630890 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.04.2013
11.02.2014
WITHDRAWN Stratic Lederwaren Jacob Bonifer GmbH Kasseler Strasse 14 63110 Rodgau / DE Opponent's representative Graf von Stosch, Andreas, et al, et al Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstraße 22 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.04.2013
11.02.2014
WITHDRAWN Stratic Lederwaren Jacob Bonifer GmbH Kasseler Strasse 14 63110 Rodgau / DE Opponent's representative Graf von Stosch, Andreas, et al, et al Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.04.2013
WITHDRAWN Stratic Lederwaren Jacob Bonifer GmbH Kasseler Strasse 14 63110 Rodgau / DE Opponent's representative Graf von Stosch, Andreas Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | 20.02.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.02.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 26.10.2014 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2015/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.10.2010 | AL | 24.04.2013 | AT | 24.04.2013 | CY | 24.04.2013 | CZ | 24.04.2013 | DK | 24.04.2013 | EE | 24.04.2013 | FI | 24.04.2013 | HR | 24.04.2013 | LT | 24.04.2013 | LV | 24.04.2013 | MC | 24.04.2013 | MK | 24.04.2013 | MT | 24.04.2013 | NL | 24.04.2013 | RO | 24.04.2013 | RS | 24.04.2013 | SE | 24.04.2013 | SI | 24.04.2013 | SK | 24.04.2013 | SM | 24.04.2013 | TR | 24.04.2013 | BG | 24.07.2013 | NO | 24.07.2013 | GR | 25.07.2013 | IS | 24.08.2013 | PT | 26.08.2013 | IE | 20.10.2013 | LU | 20.10.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/41] | HU | 20.10.2010 | |
AT | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
MK | 24.04.2013 | ||
MT | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
RS | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
SM | 24.04.2013 | ||
TR | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
IE | 20.10.2013 | ||
LU | 20.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 20.10.2010 | |
AT | 24.04.2013 | ||
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
MK | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
RS | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
SM | 24.04.2013 | ||
TR | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
IE | 20.10.2013 | ||
LU | 20.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
MK | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
RS | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
SM | 24.04.2013 | ||
TR | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
IE | 20.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
RS | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
SM | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
IE | 20.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
RS | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
IE | 20.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
RS | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
RS | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
RS | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
RS | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
RS | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
RS | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
HR | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
RS | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
LV | 24.04.2013 | ||
RS | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
LT | 24.04.2013 | ||
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 24.04.2013 | |
NO | 24.07.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US1808375 (PLOOSTER NEAL W)[I] 1-5; | [XI]US4298104 (LEONG HENRY) [X] 1-3,5,12,13 * the whole document * [I] 10,11,14,15; | [X]US6502677 (TIRAMANI PAOLO M B [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,13; | [XI]US2003099503 (MOOR MARC LYMAN [US]) [X] 1-3,5,13 * paragraphs [0029] - [0039]; figure - * [I] 4,7-9; | [X]DE202005013492U (GULCHENKO VICTOR [RU]) [X] 1-3,5,13 * paragraphs [0002] - [0018]; figure - * | International search | [Y]US4867575 (WOOD JERRY W [US]); | [Y]US5252161 (CHANG S J [US], et al); | [Y]US6044879 (RAY FRANCES E [US]); | [Y]US6502677 (TIRAMANI PAOLO M B [US], et al); | [Y]US6612413 (KUWAYAMA OSAMU [JP]) | by applicant | US4298104 | US2003099503 | other | US2003099503 | WO2008098116 | - CRUMPLER, "CRUMPLER FOTOTASCHE COMPANY GIGOLO 3500, BLACK, S, CG3500-004", AMAZON.COM, pages 1 - 5, URL: HTTP://WWW.AMAZON.DE/CRUMPLER-FOTOTASCHE-COMPANY-GIGOLO-CG3500-004/DP/B002ODHWIY/REF=SR_1_SC_1?IE=UTF8&QID=1427198133&SR=8-1-SPELL&KEYWORDS=CRUMPLER+FOTOTASCE+COMPANY+GIGOLO+3500, XP003035404 | - STRATIC, "STRATIC KOFFER AGRAVIC, 65 CM", AMAZON.COM, pages 1 - 2, XP003035405 |