EP2482172 - DISPLAY DEVICE WITH TOUCH PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.04.2014 [2014/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/31] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MISAKI Katsunori Sharp Yonago Kabushiki Kaisha 650, Ohtsukanoni, Sekishufu Yonago-shi Tottori 689-3524 / JP | [2012/31] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/31] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10826526.5 | 14.10.2010 | WO2010JP68067 | Priority number, date | JP20090250529 | 30.10.2009 Original published format: JP 2009250529 | [2012/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011052392 | Date: | 05.05.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2482172 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, G06F3/044 | [2012/31] | CPC: |
G06F3/0412 (EP,US);
G06F3/0446 (EP,US);
G02F1/13338 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04103 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/31] | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM BERÜHRUNGSBILDSCHIRM | [2012/31] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE WITH TOUCH PANEL | [2012/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE À PANNEAU TACTILE | [2012/31] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2012 | Translation filed | 26.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 06.03.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2009116433 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [A]JP2006344163 (NISSHA PRINTING); | [A]JPH09258893 (TOSHIBA CORP) | by applicant | JP2008233976 |