EP2494392 - OPTICAL SENSOR ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR MEASURING CURRENT IN AN ELECTRIC POWER DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micatu Inc. IST Center - Building 202 315 Daniel Zenker Drive Horseheads, NY 14845 / US | [2021/28] |
Former [2019/23] | For all designated states Gridview Optical Solutions, LLC Plano Distribution Center 4 2901 Summit Avenue, Suite 400 Plano, TX 75050 / US | ||
Former [2014/09] | For all designated states Optisense Network LLC 2901 Summit Ave., Suite 400 Plano TX 75074 / US | ||
Former [2012/36] | For all designated states Optisense Network, Inc. 191 PR 1400 Bridgeport, Texas 76262 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARLEV, Joseph Yossi 21 Meadowbrook Ln. Trophy Club, Texas 76262 / US | 02 /
VEAZEY, Rhad 465 County Road 3573 Paradise, Texas 76073 / US | 03 /
KONETSKI, Theodore 1324 Oak Harbor Blvd. Azle, Texas 76020 / US | 04 /
JOHNSON, Leonard 2000 Spyglass Hill Leander, Texas 78641 / US | [2017/49] |
Former [2012/36] | 01 /
HARLEV, Joseph Yossi 21 Meadowbrook Ln. Trophy Club Texas 76262 / US | ||
02 /
VEAZEY, Rhad 465 County Road 3573 Paradise Texas 76073 / US | |||
03 /
KONETSKI, Theodore 1324 Oak Harbor Blvd. Azle Texas 76020 / US | |||
04 /
JOHNSON, Leonard 2000 Spyglass Hill Leander, Texas 78641 / US | Representative(s) | Guardian IP Consulting I/S Diplomvej, Building 381 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [2023/23] |
Former [2013/52] | Schwarze, Holm Guardian IP Consulting I/S Diplomvej, Building 381 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | ||
Former [2012/40] | Verhees, Godefridus Josephus Maria Brabants Octrooibureau, De Pinckart 54 5674 CC Nuenen / NL | ||
Former [2012/36] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 10827441.6 | 27.10.2010 | [2023/23] | WO2010US54333 | Priority number, date | US20090607954 | 28.10.2009 Original published format: US 607954 | US20090612894 | 05.11.2009 Original published format: US 612894 | [2012/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011053657 | Date: | 05.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2494392 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2494392 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01R15/14, G01R15/24, G01R1/22, G01R1/07 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
G01R1/071 (EP,KR,US);
G01R31/083 (KR);
G01N21/66 (KR);
G01R1/22 (EP,KR,US);
G01R15/142 (EP,KR,US);
G01R15/246 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/36] | G02B6/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHE SENSORANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STROMMESSUNG IN EINEM ELEKTRISCHEN STROMVERTEILUNGSSYSTEM | [2023/02] | English: | OPTICAL SENSOR ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR MEASURING CURRENT IN AN ELECTRIC POWER DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM | [2012/36] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE CAPTEUR OPTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE COURANT DANS UN SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION D'ÉLECTRICITÉ | [2023/02] |
Former [2012/36] | OPTISCHE SENSORANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STROMMESSUNG IN EINEM STROMVERTEILUNGSSYSTEM | ||
Former [2012/36] | ENSEMBLE CAPTEUR OPTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE D'UN COURANT DANS UN SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 29.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 31.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2020 | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 13.03.2014 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2019/09] | 02.05.2019 | Resumption of proceedings | [2019/09] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6188811 (BLAKE JAMES N [US]) [I] 12-15 * figures 1A,3A,4 * * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 23 ** column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 63 *; | [A]US2001043064 (BOSSELMANN THOMAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0052] *; | [XA]US2003017753 (PALMISANO ANDREW J [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * figures 6-4 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0012] , [0013] , [0017] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0030] * [A] 12-15 | International search | [Y]US4564754 (SATO TADASHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US5130642 (HOFFMAN MARK R [US], et al); | [Y]US5311138 (OTT KARL [DE], et al); | [A]US5732167 (ISHIKO DAISUKE [JP], et al); | [Y]US6188811 (BLAKE JAMES N [US]); | [Y]US2006170410 (BJORN LARS N [DK]) | by applicant | US4590505 | US5963026 | US2003017753 |