EP2497845 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING SURFACE-TREATED STEEL SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyo Kohan Co., Ltd. 2-12, Yonbancho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-8447 / JP | [2012/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUBARA, Masanobu c/o TOYO KOHAN CO. LTD. Technical Research Laboratory 1296-1 Higashitoyoi Kudamatsu-shi Yamaguchi 744-8611 / JP | [2012/37] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10828043.9 | 27.09.2010 | WO2010JP05800 | Priority number, date | JP20090253360 | 04.11.2009 Original published format: JP 2009253360 | [2012/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011055481 | Date: | 12.05.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2497845 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C25D5/36, C25D3/30, C25D5/50, // C25D7/06 | [2016/40] | CPC: |
C25D5/505 (EP);
C25D3/30 (EP);
C25D5/36 (EP);
C25D7/0614 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/37] | C25D5/26, C25D3/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDELTEN STAHLBLECHS | [2012/37] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING SURFACE-TREATED STEEL SHEET | [2012/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE FEUILLE D'ACIER TRAITÉE EN SURFACE | [2012/37] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2012 | Translation filed | 01.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2012 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/37] | 27.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/07] | 27.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.10.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2246319 (TOYO KOHAN CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,12,13 * page 6, line 25 - page 8, line 1 * * page 9, line 1 - line 35 * * examples 1-4 * * page 13, line 27 - page 14, line 11 *; | [XI]US4816348 (KAWAMURA HIROAKI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 29 - column 5, line 43 * * column 9, line 63 - column 10, line 4 * [I] 4-11; | [A]JP3252725B (NIPPON KOKAN KK) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0024] * * examples 1-46; tables 1-4 * | International search | [Y]JPH10121286 (NIPPON KOKAN KK); | [Y]JPH1192989 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO); | [Y]JPH11254586 (MITSUBISHI PLASTICS IND); | [A]JPH07207489 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) | by applicant | JP2002285354 |