EP2493998 - THERMAL INTERFACE MATERIAL WITH EPOXIDIZED NUTSHELL OIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel IP & Holding GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2014/51] |
Former [2014/33] | For all designated states Henkel US IP LLC One Henkel Way Rocky Hill, CT 06067 / US | ||
Former [2012/36] | For all designated states Henkel Corporation One Henkel Way Rocky Hill, CT 06067 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NGUYEN, My, Nhu 13015 Edina Way Poway CA 92064 / US | 02 /
CHAN, Chew, Beng 14651 Clearbrook Drive Chino Hills CA 91709 / US | [2012/36] | Representative(s) | Henkel IP Department c/o Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | Waloch, Christoph Andreas Henkel AG & Co. KGaA FJI Patents 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 10828821.8 | 25.10.2010 | WO2010US53929 | Priority number, date | US20090255306P | 27.10.2009 Original published format: US 255306 P | [2012/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011056499 | Date: | 12.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2493998 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.10.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/14, C08L63/00 | [2018/02] | CPC: |
C09K5/14 (EP,US);
C09K5/08 (KR);
C08G59/22 (EP,US);
C08G59/226 (EP,US);
C08L63/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/08 (EP,US);
C08K5/0025 (EP,US);
C08K5/1515 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16225 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08L63/00, C08L2666/22 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73204, H01L2224/16225, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2012/36] | C09K5/10, C08L63/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/36] | Title | German: | WÄRMESCHNITTSTELLENMATERIAL MIT EPOXIDISIERTEM NUSSSCHALENÖL | [2012/36] | English: | THERMAL INTERFACE MATERIAL WITH EPOXIDIZED NUTSHELL OIL | [2012/36] | French: | MATÉRIAU D'INTERFACE THERMIQUE AVEC HUILE DE COQUILLE DE NOIX ÉPOXYDÉE | [2012/36] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 20.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/11] | 24.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5929141 (LAU STEVEN E [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 6, lines 56-65; column 9, lines 10-30; column 10, lines 1-14 *; | [A]US5575956 (HERMANSEN RALPH D [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 4, lines 33-61; column 7, lines 11-20 * | International search | [A]US2002175316 (SHIMIZU KOZO [JP], et al); | [A]US7551346 (FAZEL SHAFIQ N [US], et al); | [A]US6395385 (CHANG CHUNG-YING [US], et al); | [A]US6114413 (KANG SUNG KWON [US], et al); | [A]US5719255 (HEUCHER REIMAR [DE], et al); | [A]US4322325 (ESSER KLAUS, et al) |