EP2496151 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR REMOVAL OF IMPLANTABLE INTRAVASCULAR DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2013 | Change - applicant | published on 03.07.2013 [2013/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synecor, LLC 3908 Patriot Drive Suite 170 Durham, NC 27703 / US | [2013/27] |
Former [2012/37] | For all designated states Innerpulse 4025 Stirrup Creek Drive Suite 200 Research Triangle Park, NC 27703 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FIFER, Daniel c/o Innerpulse 4025 Stirrup Creek Drive Suite 200 Research Triangle Park NC 27703 / US | 02 /
GLENN, Richard c/o Innerpulse 4025 Stirrup Creek Drive Suite 200 Research Triangle Park NC 27703 / US | 03 /
SMITH, Jeffrey c/o Innerpulse 4025 Stirrup Creek Drive Suite 200 Research Triangle Park NC 27703 / US | 04 /
ORTH, Geoff c/o Innerpulse 4025 Stirrup Creek Drive Suite 200 Research Triangle Park NC 27703 / US | 05 /
WILLIAMS, Michael c/o Innerpulse 4025 Stirrup Creek Drive Suite 200 Research Triangle Park NC 27703 / US | 06 /
SANDERS, William, M.D. c/o Innerpulse 4025 Stirrup Creek Drive Suite 200 Research Triangle Park NC 27703 / US | 07 /
BARDSLEY, Earl c/o Innerpulse 4025 Stirrup Creek Drive Suite 200 Research Triangle Park NC 27703 / US | 08 /
GRACZYK, Wendy c/o Innerpulse 4025 Stirrup Creek Drive Suite 200 Research Triangle Park NC 27703 / US | [2012/37] | Representative(s) | Millburn, Julie Elizabeth, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | Millburn, Julie Elizabeth, et al Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London, Greater London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 10829244.2 | 08.11.2010 | WO2010US55863 | Priority number, date | US20090258773P | 06.11.2009 Original published format: US 258773 P | [2012/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011057210 | Date: | 12.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2496151 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/3205, A61B17/32, A61B17/22, A61N1/372, A61N1/36 | [2012/37] | CPC: |
A61B17/320016 (EP,US);
A61B17/29 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00358 (EP,US);
A61B2017/32006 (EP,US);
A61N1/37205 (EP,US);
A61N2001/0578 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR ENTFERNUNG IMPLANTIERBARER MEDIZINISCHER VORRICHTUNGEN | [2012/37] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR REMOVAL OF IMPLANTABLE INTRAVASCULAR DEVICES | [2012/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES POUR RETIRER DES DISPOSITIFS INTRAVASCULAIRES IMPLANTABLES | [2012/37] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2012 | Search fee paid | 06.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/37] | 31.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/20] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4943289 (GOODE LOUIS [US], et al); | [A]US5779715 (TU HOSHENG [US]); | [A]US6346106 (JAKO GEZA J [US]); | [A]US2009192579 (RANSBURY TERRANCE [US], et al) |