EP2499155 - ANTIBIOFILM GLYCOPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.04.2016 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.2016 [2016/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oral Health Australia Pty Ltd Faculty of Medicine, Dentistry and Health Sciences Melbourne Dental School Level 6, 720 Swanston Street Carlton, VIC 3053 / AU | [2012/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REYNOLDS, Eric Charles c/- The University of Melbourne 720 Swanston Street Carlton, Victoria 305 / AU | 02 /
DASHPER, Stuart Geoffrey c/- The University of Melbourne 720 Swanston Street Carlton, Victoria 3053 / AU | [2012/38] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/38] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10829353.1 | 11.11.2010 | WO2010AU01506 | Priority number, date | AU20090905526 | 11.11.2009 Original published format: AU 2009905526 | [2012/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011057336 | Date: | 19.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2499155 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 19.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47, A61Q11/00, A61K8/64 | [2015/30] | CPC: |
C07K14/4732 (EP,US);
A61K38/018 (EP);
A61K38/1709 (EP);
A61K8/64 (EP,US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2012/38] | C07K14/00, A61Q11/00, C07K14/435, A61K8/64, C07K7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/38] | Title | German: | ANTIBIOFILM-GLYCOPEPTIDE | [2012/38] | English: | ANTIBIOFILM GLYCOPEPTIDES | [2012/38] | French: | GLYCOPEPTIDES ANTIBIOFILM | [2012/38] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2012 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/38] | 11.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/18] | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   12.05.2015 | 30.11.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0009080 (NESTLE SA [CH], et al) [X] 1-4,8-11,13 * example 4; claims 14,21 *; | [X]US2003114364 (BRAUN STEVEN D [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-11,13 * paragraph [0005] *; | [T] - STUART G. DASHPER ET AL, "Streptococcus mutans biofilm disruption by [kappa]-casein glycopeptide", JOURNAL OF DENTISTRY, (20130401), doi:10.1016/j.jdent.2013.03.010, ISSN 0300-5712, XP055062928 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jdent.2013.03.010 | International search | [X]US4992420 (NEESER JEAN-RICHARD [CH]); | [X]US4994441 (NEESER JEAN-RICHARD [CH]); | [X]WO9740811 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]); | [X]US5968901 (ANDERSSON BENGT [SE], et al); | [A]WO2005058344 (UNIV MELBOURNE [AU], et al); | [A]US7588752 (REYNOLDS ERIC C [AU], et al); | [X] - VACCA-SMITH, A.M ET AL., "The Effect of Milk and kappa Casein on Streptococcal Glucosyltransferase", CARIES RES, (1995), vol. 29, pages 498 - 506, XP008157286 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000262121 | [X] - VACCA-SMITH, A.M ET AL., "The Effects of Milk and kappa Casein on Salivary Pellicle Formed on Hydroxyapatite Discs in situ", CARIES RES, (2000), vol. 344, pages 88 - 93, XP008157287 | [X] - SCHUPBACH, P. ET AL., "Incorporation of Caseinoglycomacropeptide and Caseinophosphopeptide into the Salivary Pellicle Inhibits Adherence of Mutans Streptococci.", J DENT RES, (1996), vol. 75, no. 10, pages 1779 - 1788, XP008157288 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/00220345960750101101 | [X] - DASHPER, S.G. ET AL., "Divalent Metal Cations Increase the Activity of the Antimicrobial Peptide Kappacin.", ANTIMICROB. AGENTS CHEMTHER, (2005), vol. 49, no. 6, pages 2322 - 2328, XP008157298 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AAC.49.6.2322-2328.2005 | [A] - MALKOSKI, M. ET AL., "Kappacin, A novel antibacterial peptide from bovine milk", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY., (200108), vol. 45, no. 8, pages 2309 - 2315, XP008157292 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AAC.45.8.2309-2315.2001 |