EP2500071 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR RECOVERING VOLATILE LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2016 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rosa, Airton Da Silva Rua Senador Felipe Schmidt n° 362 Apto: 604B Bairro Centro 89201-440 Joinville- Santa Catarina / BR | [2012/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSA, Airton da Silva Rua Senador Felipe Schmidt no. 362 apto: 604B Bairro Centro 89201-440 Joinville- Santa Catarina / BR | 02 /
NETO, Ernesto Raizer Rua Laura Pinto Ferreira n° 12 Bairro Centro 88380-000 Piçarras- Santa Catarina / BR | [2012/38] | Representative(s) | Keller Schneider Patent- und Markenanwälte AG (Zürich) Beethovenstrasse 49 Postfach 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/38] | Schneider Feldmann AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Beethovenstrasse 49 Postfach 2792 8022 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 10829388.7 | 12.11.2010 | WO2010BR00382 | Priority number, date | BR2009PI04627 | 12.11.2009 Original published format: BR PI0904627 | [2012/38] | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011057375 | Date: | 19.05.2011 | Language: | PT | [2011/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2500071 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | BR | 19.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01D5/00, F28B5/00, B67D7/04, B01D53/00, B01D53/26, B01D3/10 | [2013/28] | CPC: |
B01D3/105 (EP,US);
B01D5/0015 (EP,US);
B01D5/0057 (EP,US);
B01D53/002 (EP,US);
B01D2257/708 (EP,US);
B01D2259/4516 (EP,US);
B01D53/1487 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/38] | B01D5/00, F28B5/00, B67D7/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/38] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR WIEDERGEWINNUNG FLÜCHTIGER FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2012/38] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR RECOVERING VOLATILE LIQUIDS | [2012/38] | French: | ÉQUIPEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA RÉCUPÉRATION DE LIQUIDES VOLATILS | [2012/38] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2012 | Translation filed | 04.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/38] | 12.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 30.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.01.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO0071223 (ALFA LAVAL AB [SE], et al) [I] 1-12 * figures 1-10; claims 1-15 *; | [A]WO2004092307 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]WO03006358 (SELLCO SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-12 * figures 1-5; claims 1-11 * | International search | [Y]JPS56100603 (DAIYO SANSO); | [Y]FR2852528 (LGL FRANCE [FR]); | [YP]BRPI0803158 (NETO ERNESTO RAIZER [BR], et al) | by applicant | BR9205606 | US5220799 | BR9600925 | BR9905312 |