EP2372334 - VEHICLE-BODY INTEGRATED TEST BENCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 17.11.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qingdao Sifang Rolling Stock Research Institute Co., Ltd. 231 Ruichang Road Sifang Qingdao, Shandong 266000 / CN | [2011/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MA, Fei 231 Ruichang Road Sifang Qingdao Shandong 266000 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Jie 231 Ruichang Road Sifang Qingdao Shandong 266000 / CN | 03 /
PANG, Yuanfeng 231 Ruichang Road Sifang Qingdao Shandong 266000 / CN | [2011/40] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/41] | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2011/40] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10829460.4 | 25.06.2010 | WO2010CN74455 | Priority number, date | CN200910210782 | 10.11.2009 Original published format: CN200910210782 | [2011/40] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011057496 | Date: | 19.05.2011 | Language: | ZH | [2011/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2372334 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2372334 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01M17/08 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
G01M17/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IN EINE FAHRZEUGKAROSSERIE INTEGRIERTER PRÜFSTAND | [2011/40] | English: | VEHICLE-BODY INTEGRATED TEST BENCH | [2011/40] | French: | BANC D'ESSAI INTÉGRÉ À LA CARROSSERIE D'UN VÉHICULE | [2011/40] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2011 | Translation filed | 27.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2011 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 24.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.07.2015
02.07.2015
ADMISSIBLE SIEMENS AG ÖSTERREICH Siemensstrasse 90 1210 Wien / AT Opponent's representative Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | 02
08.07.2015
16.07.2015
ADMISSIBLE VÚKV, a.s. Bucharova 1314/8 15800 Prague 5 / CZ Opponent's representative Loskotová, Jarmila K Závetinám 727 155 00 Praha 5 / CZ | [N/P] |
Former [2015/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.07.2015
02.07.2015
ADMISSIBLE SIEMENS AG ÖSTERREICH Siemensstrasse 90 1210 Wien / AT Opponent's representative Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
02
08.07.2015
16.07.2015
ADMISSIBLE VÚKV, a.s. Bucharova 1314/8 15800 Prague 5 / CZ Opponent's representative Loskotová, Jarmila K Závetinám 727 155 00 Praha 5 / CZ | |||
Former [2015/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.07.2015
02.07.2015
ADMISSIBLE SIEMENS AG ÖSTERREICH Siemensstrasse 90 1210 Wien / AT Opponent's representative Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | 21.08.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.03.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.04.2017 | 12.04.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.08.2017 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 13.08.2017 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2017/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.06.2010 | AL | 08.10.2014 | AT | 08.10.2014 | BE | 08.10.2014 | BG | 08.10.2014 | CY | 08.10.2014 | CZ | 08.10.2014 | DK | 08.10.2014 | EE | 08.10.2014 | ES | 08.10.2014 | FI | 08.10.2014 | HR | 08.10.2014 | IT | 08.10.2014 | LT | 08.10.2014 | LV | 08.10.2014 | MC | 08.10.2014 | MK | 08.10.2014 | MT | 08.10.2014 | NL | 08.10.2014 | PL | 08.10.2014 | RO | 08.10.2014 | SI | 08.10.2014 | SK | 08.10.2014 | SM | 08.10.2014 | TR | 08.10.2014 | NO | 08.01.2015 | GR | 09.01.2015 | IS | 08.02.2015 | PT | 09.02.2015 | IE | 25.06.2015 | LU | 25.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | GB | 25.06.2016 | SE | 26.06.2016 | FR | 30.06.2016 | DE | 03.01.2017 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 25.06.2010 | |
AT | 08.10.2014 | ||
BE | 08.10.2014 | ||
BG | 08.10.2014 | ||
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MK | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
SM | 08.10.2014 | ||
TR | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
IE | 25.06.2015 | ||
LU | 25.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
GB | 25.06.2016 | ||
SE | 26.06.2016 | ||
FR | 30.06.2016 | ||
DE | 03.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/46] | HU | 25.06.2010 | |
AT | 08.10.2014 | ||
BE | 08.10.2014 | ||
BG | 08.10.2014 | ||
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
SM | 08.10.2014 | ||
TR | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
IE | 25.06.2015 | ||
LU | 25.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
GB | 25.06.2016 | ||
SE | 26.06.2016 | ||
FR | 30.06.2016 | ||
DE | 03.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 25.06.2010 | |
AT | 08.10.2014 | ||
BG | 08.10.2014 | ||
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
SM | 08.10.2014 | ||
TR | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
IE | 25.06.2015 | ||
LU | 25.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
GB | 25.06.2016 | ||
SE | 26.06.2016 | ||
FR | 30.06.2016 | ||
DE | 03.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | HU | 25.06.2010 | |
AT | 08.10.2014 | ||
BG | 08.10.2014 | ||
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
SM | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
IE | 25.06.2015 | ||
LU | 25.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
GB | 25.06.2016 | ||
SE | 26.06.2016 | ||
FR | 30.06.2016 | ||
DE | 03.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
IE | 25.06.2015 | ||
LU | 25.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
SE | 26.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
IE | 25.06.2015 | ||
LU | 25.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
IE | 25.06.2015 | ||
LU | 25.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
IE | 25.06.2015 | ||
LU | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
LU | 25.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
IT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 08.10.2014 | |
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
PL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 08.10.2014 | |
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | NL | 08.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4305300 (PETERSEN PAUL S, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4793047 (CURTIS DANIEL L [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]CN201004014Y (UNIV HEBEI POLYTECHNIC [CN]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]CN101281085 (SAIC CHERY AUTOMOBILE CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0310520 (RENAULT AUTOMATION [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [A]EP0310520 (RENAULT AUTOMATION [FR]); | [A]CN201004014Y (UNIV HEBEI POLYTECHNIC [CN]); | [A]EP1918689 (SCHENCK PROCESS GMBH [DE]); | [A]CN101281085 (SAIC CHERY AUTOMOBILE CO LTD [CN]); | [XP]CN101699247 (QINGDAO SIFANG SRI) |