EP2500083 - HOLLOW FIBER MEMBRANE MODULE FOR USE IN PRODUCTION OF CHEMICAL SUBSTANCE, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF CHEMICAL SUBSTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2012/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEUCHI, Norihiro c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 02 /
MINEGISHI, Shin-ichi c/o Tokyo Head Office Toray Industries Inc. 8-1 Mihama 1-chome Urayasu-shi Chiba 279-8555 / JP | 03 /
CHEON, Jihoon c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 04 /
NISHIDA, Makoto c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 05 /
MIMITSUKA, Takashi c/o Basic Research Laboratories Toray Industries Inc. 10-1 Tebiro 6-chome Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 248-8555 / JP | 06 /
SUZUKI, Hironobu c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | 07 /
YAMADA, Katsushige c/o Basic Research Laboratories Toray Industries Inc. 10-1 Tebiro 6-chome Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 248-8555 / JP | 08 /
SAWAI, Hideki c/o Basic Research Laboratories Toray Industries Inc. 10-1 Tebiro 6-chome Kamakura-shi Kanagawa 248-8555 / JP | 09 /
KUMO, Ichiro c/o Shiga Plant Toray Industries Inc. 1-1 Sonoyama 1-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8558 / JP | [2012/38] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/38] | Hoefer & Partner Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10829942.1 | 10.11.2010 | WO2010JP69969 | Priority number, date | JP20090256778 | 10.11.2009 Original published format: JP 2009256778 | [2012/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011058983 | Date: | 19.05.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2500083 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B01D63/04, B01D63/00, B01D71/34, C12M1/12, C12M3/06, C12N15/09, C12P7/56, B01D65/02 | [2014/33] | CPC: |
B01D63/04 (EP,KR,US);
B01D63/0221 (EP,KR,US);
B01D63/023 (EP,US);
B01D71/34 (KR);
C12M1/12 (KR);
C12M29/16 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/38] | B01D63/04, B01D63/00, B01D71/34, C12M1/12, C12M3/06, C12N15/09, C12P7/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/38] | Title | German: | HOHLFASERMEMBRANENMODUL ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER HERSTELLUNG EINER CHEMISCHEN SUBSTANZ UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER CHEMISCHEN SUBSTANZ | [2012/38] | English: | HOLLOW FIBER MEMBRANE MODULE FOR USE IN PRODUCTION OF CHEMICAL SUBSTANCE, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF CHEMICAL SUBSTANCE | [2012/38] | French: | MODULE DE MEMBRANES À FIBRES CREUSES DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ DANS LA PRODUCTION D'UNE SUBSTANCE CHIMIQUE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE SUBSTANCE CHIMIQUE | [2012/38] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2012 | Translation filed | 25.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2012 | Search fee paid | 25.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/38] | 09.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0199518 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [X]JPH0557154 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [XD]JPH0760074 (KURARAY CO); | [X]US5472601 (EGUCHI TAMIYUKI [JP]); | [A]EP0750938 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [XD]JP2005230813 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [X]EP1803756 (NIPPON POLYURETHANE KOGYO KK [JP]); | [X]WO2008040687 (BASF AG [DE], et al); | [X]EP1967536 (NIPPON POLYURETHANE KOGYO KK [JP]) | International search | [A]JP2008099667 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [A]JP2008237101 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [AP]JP2010029108 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) | by applicant | JPH0760074 | JP2005230813 | JP2007252367 | JP2008237101 |