EP2499734 - PHASED ARRAY BUCKLING ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Massachusetts Institute of Technology 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2012/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASADA, Haruhiko Harry 147 Old Country Road Lincoln, Massachusetts 01773 / US | 02 /
NEAL, Devin Michael 410 Memorial Drive Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | [2013/08] |
Former [2012/38] | 01 /
ASADA, Haruhiko Harry 147 Old Country Road Lincoln, Massachusetts 01773 / US | ||
02 /
NEAL, Devin Michael 36 Houghton Street Somerville, Massachusetts 02143 / US | Representative(s) | Suèr, Steven Johannes, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks TN13 3AJ / GB | [2014/46] |
Former [2012/38] | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co. LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks, TN13 3AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10830583.0 | 09.11.2010 | WO2010US55965 | Priority number, date | US20090259873P | 10.11.2009 Original published format: US 259873 P | [2012/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011059956 | Date: | 19.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2499734 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.11.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02N2/02, H02N2/10 | [2014/19] | CPC: |
H02N2/043 (EP,US);
H02N2/02 (EP,US);
H02N2/105 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18888 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/38] | H02N2/00, H02N2/02, H02N2/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/38] | Title | German: | PHASENGESTEUERTER KNICKAKTUATOR | [2012/38] | English: | PHASED ARRAY BUCKLING ACTUATOR | [2012/38] | French: | ACTIONNEUR DE FLAMBAGE À GROUPEMENT PHASÉ | [2012/38] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 02.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/38] | 11.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/24] | 16.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6122775 (ASAHI OKUMA IND); | [A]JPS61284352 (HITACHI MAXELL); | [A]DE19746609 (KOENIG WILHELM [DE]); | International search | [A]WO0152400 (ATHANAS LEWIS [US]); | [A]JP2002354853 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [A]KR20070072211 (KOREA ELECTRO TECH RES INST [KR]); | [A]KR100768513B (INOVA INC [KR]) |