EP2499305 - INTEGRITY MONITORED CONCRETE PILINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smart Structures Inc. 324 South Second Street Pike 13 Southampton, Pennsylvania 18966 / US | [2012/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HECHT, Kurt 935 Tower View Circle New Hope Pennsylvania 18938 / US | [2012/38] | Representative(s) | LBP Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Siegfried-Kühn-Straße 4 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/21] | Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bismarckstraße 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [2012/38] | Kaiser, Magnus Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstrasse 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 10830759.6 | 12.11.2010 | WO2010US56444 | Priority number, date | US20090260995P | 13.11.2009 Original published format: US 260995 P | [2012/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011060214 | Date: | 19.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2499305 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E02D31/02 | [2012/38] | CPC: |
E02D33/00 (EP,US);
E02D5/34 (EP,US);
G01M5/0041 (EP,US);
G01M5/0066 (EP,US);
G01M5/0083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/38] | Title | German: | BETONPFEILER MIT INTAKTHEITSÜBERWACHUNG | [2012/38] | English: | INTEGRITY MONITORED CONCRETE PILINGS | [2012/38] | French: | PIEU EN BÉTON À INTÉGRITÉ CONTRÔLÉE | [2012/38] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 18.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/38] | 02.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/47] | 06.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3603141 (KINKEAD ALFRED NORMAN); | [A]US4336595 (ADAMS THOMAS E, et al); | [A]US5086651 (WESTERMO BRUCE [US], et al); | [A]US2001049968 (KIM JIN KEUN [KR], et al); | [A]US6533502 (MCVAY MICHAEL C [US], et al); | [X]US2006021447 (HECHT KURT [US], et al); | [A]US2009169380 (NIES JACOB JOHANNES [NL], et al) |