EP2502090 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING RELATIVE POSITIONS OF MULTIPLE LOUDSPEAKERS IN A SPACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adamson Systems Engineering Inc. 1401 Scugog Line 6 Port Perry, Ontario L9L 1B2 / CA | [2012/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADAMSON, Alan Brock 945 Blue Mountain Road Greenbank, Ontario L0C 1B0 / CA | 02 /
HLIBOWICKI, Stefan Roman 139 Clappison Blvd. Scarborough, Ontario M1C 2H3 / CA | [2012/39] | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10830991.5 | 19.11.2010 | WO2010CA01823 | Priority number, date | US20090262711P | 19.11.2009 Original published format: US 262711 P | [2012/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011060535 | Date: | 26.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2502090 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 26.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/26, G01S5/22, H04R5/02, H04R29/00 | [2013/27] | CPC: |
G01S5/22 (EP,US);
H04R29/007 (EP,US);
H04R29/002 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/39] | G01S5/26, G01S5/22, H04R5/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER RELATIVEN POSITION MEHRERER LAUTSPRECHER IN EINEM RAUM | [2012/39] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING RELATIVE POSITIONS OF MULTIPLE LOUDSPEAKERS IN A SPACE | [2012/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR DÉTERMINER DES POSITIONS RELATIVES DE PLUSIEURS HAUT-PARLEURS DANS L'ESPACE | [2012/39] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2012 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/39] | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/30] | 10.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003119523 (BULTHUIS WILLEM [US]) [X] 1-23 * paragraphs [0021] - [0023] *; | [X]US2005152557 (SASAKI TORU [JP], et al) [X] 1-23 * paragraphs [0208] - [0242] *; | [A]EP1718114 (YAMAHA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2007110477 (GENELEC OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [E]EP2375779 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [E] 1-23* the whole document * | International search | [A]US5657393 (CROW ROBERT P [US]); | [A]US2005008169 (MUREN PETTER [NO], et al); | [A]US6868045 (SCHROEDER ERNST F [DE]); | [A]US7336793 (HORBACH ULRICH [US], et al) |