EP2501273 - A METHOD AND EXAMINATION DEVICE FOR IMAGING AN ORGAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Optomed Oy Hallituskatu 13-17 D 96 90100 Oulu / FI | [2012/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOLMA, Ilkka Uusikatu 57-59 A 309 FI-90120 Oulu / FI | 02 /
VIRTA, Markku Hietaniementie 35 FI-90440 Kempele / FI | 03 /
TUOHIMAA, Mikko Kurikkahaantie 8 A 1 FI-90440 Kempele / FI | 04 /
LIPPONEN, Juha Rajakaltionkatu 2 B 65 FI-90530 Oulu / FI | [2012/39] | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab (Salmisaarenaukio 1) P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2013/43] | Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 PO Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2012/39] | Karppinen, Olavi Arto Kolster Oy Ab P.O. Box 148 (Iso Roobertinkatu 23) 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 10831198.6 | 16.11.2010 | WO2010FI50920 | Priority number, date | FI20090006190 | 17.11.2009 Original published format: FI 20096190 | [2012/39] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011061392 | Date: | 26.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2501273 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 26.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/14, A61B3/11 | [2012/39] | CPC: |
A61B3/14 (EP,FI,US);
A61B3/0008 (FI);
A61B3/1208 (FI);
A61B3/112 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND UNTERSUCHUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR ABBILDUNG EINES ORGANS | [2012/39] | English: | A METHOD AND EXAMINATION DEVICE FOR IMAGING AN ORGAN | [2012/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'EXAMEN POUR L'IMAGERIE D'UN ORGANE | [2012/39] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 22.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: FI | 22.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/39] | 11.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/52] | 20.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.03.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE102005003440 (ZEISS CARL MEDITEC AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,9,10 * paragraphs [0031] , [0 38]; figure 1 * [Y] 4-8,13-16 [I] 3,12; | [IY]WO2004107968 (ZEISS CARL MEDITEC AG [DE], et al) [I] 1-3,9-12 * abstract * [Y] 4-8,13-16 | International search | [X]US2007146535 (NANJO TSUGUO [JP]); | [X]US2003025876 (NANJO TSUGUO [JP]); | [X]WO2004000109 (MEDIMAKER OY LTD [FI], et al); | [X]US6616277 (DAVENPORT WAYNE E [US]); | [X]US2005225722 (TAWADA AKIRA [JP], et al); | [X]US2009251665 (HARA HIROSHI [JP]); | [A]WO2009050339 (OPTOMED OY [FI], et al) |