EP2503705 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM FOR A HIGH-SPEED OBJECT THAT MOVES ON A FIXED PATH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IHM, Bin Chul LG Institute 533 Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | 02 /
KANG, Ji Won LG Institute 533 Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | 03 /
PARK, Sung Ho LG Institute 533 Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Wook Bong LG Institute 533 Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | 05 /
LEE, Moon Il LG Institute 533 Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | [2012/39] | Representative(s) | Katérle, Axel, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | Katérle, Axel, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10831743.9 | 26.10.2010 | WO2010KR07390 | Priority number, date | US20090262153P | 18.11.2009 Original published format: US 262153 P | KR20100085353 | 01.09.2010 Original published format: KR 20100085353 | [2012/39] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011062376 | Date: | 26.05.2011 | Language: | KO | [2011/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2503705 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.09.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/04, H04B1/04, H04B7/06 | [2013/44] | CPC: |
H04B7/0617 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/061 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0417 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/063 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0665 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/0691 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/39] | H04B7/04, H04B1/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/39] | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSES KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM FÜR EIN IN HOCHGESCHWINDIGKEIT AUF EINEM FESTGELEGTEN PFAD BEWEGTES OBJEKT | [2012/39] | English: | WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM FOR A HIGH-SPEED OBJECT THAT MOVES ON A FIXED PATH | [2012/39] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL POUR UN OBJET À GRANDE VITESSE QUI SE DÉPLACE SUR UN CHEMIN FIXE | [2012/39] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2012 | Translation filed | 10.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2012 | Search fee paid | 10.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/39] | 17.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/19] | 20.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2007091836 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-3,5-9,11,12 * figures 3-5; claims 1-8 * * page 10, line 4 - page 11, line 35 * * page 12, lines 22-33 * * page 13, lines 25-32 * * page 14, lines 3-23 * * page 15, lines 11-12,33-35 * [Y] 4,10; | [X]EP1895680 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-3,7-9* paragraphs [0034] , [0067] - [0073]; figures 1,3,5 *; | [Y]WO2009128657 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [Y] 4,10 * page 62, line 22 - page 64, line 4; figure 20(a)(b) * | International search | [A]US2009232510 (GUPTA DEEPNARAYAN [US], et al) | [A] - Y. OFUJI ET AL., "Field Experimental Results of E-UTRA Downlink with Precoding and Non-Precoding MIMO", 2009 IEEE 69TH VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, (20090429), pages 1 - 5 | [A] - T. HAUSTEIN ET AL., "Real-Time Signal Processing for Multiantenna Systems: Algorithms, Optimization, and Implementation on an Experimental Test-Bed", EURASIP JOURNAL ON APPLIED SIGNAL PROCESSING, (20060101), vol. 2006 |